CTP Innovations, LLC v. American Printing Company, Inc.

Defendant: American Printing Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: CTP Innovations, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00582
Filed: June 14, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 MOTION TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/25/2014 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 1/21/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 11, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Accordingly, this action is transferred to Chief District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr. as a"Related Case" to Civil Action No. 3:13-0583. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/12/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified on 3/12/2014 (dt).
March 12, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Initial Case Management Conference scheduled in case no. 3:13-582 for March 25, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby cancelled. Absent further orders, there will be no further proceedings before the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 3/12/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: CTP Innovations, LLC v. American Printing Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Printing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Ray Pierce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CTP Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Maia T. Woodhouse
Represented By: Samuel Flint Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]