Askew v. Elite Nails

Plaintiff: Lisa R. Askew
Defendant: Elite Nails
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00629
Filed: June 27, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Todd J. Campbell
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/2/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Todd J. Campbell. Exhibit List, Witness List and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/17/2014. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/18/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 28, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Inasmuch as there appear to be no further proceedings to be conducted before the Magistrate Judge, the Clerk is directed to term the referral and transmit this file to Judge Campbell. If the parties believe Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) would be useful, they may contact the Magistrate Judge's office to request assistance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 7/28/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 18, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT re 24 and 27 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/18/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 18, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 24) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 27) is DENIED. Plaintiff's claims regarding her neuropathy and cardiac problems are DISMISSED. This matter remains set for a jury trial on December 2, 2014, with a pretrial conference on November 24, 2014. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/18/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Askew v. Elite Nails
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa R. Askew
Represented By: R. Barry Gearon, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Nails
Represented By: Wendy Lynne Longmire
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]