Leonard v. Earth Solutions, Inc.

Defendant: Earth Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Leonard
Case Number: 3:2013cv00699
Filed: July 16, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Rutherford
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/14/2014 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2014 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 10/7/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/7/2014. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/17/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 19, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The plaintiff has filed a Motion to Compel Discovery And Rule 26 Initial Disclosures 19 that is in violation of provisions in the Initial Case Management Order that require a telephone conference with Judge Trauger before the filing of discovery motions (Docket No. 16 at 3). This motion will be held in abeyance until counsel contacts Judge Trauger's chambers in order to arrange the required telephone conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/19/14. (dt)
March 24, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: A discovery dispute telephone conference was held on March 24, 2014. Defendant shall provide complete written discovery responses to the plaintiff by close of business on Monday, March 31, 2014. If those responses are not timely received, the plaintiff has permission to file a motion to activate its Motion to Compel Discovery and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures 19 , and the court would be inclined to award attorney's fees to the plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/24/14. (dt)
April 24, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: After a hearing in this matter on 4/24/2014, the motion to compel discovery and Rule 26 initial disclosures 19 is DENIED as moot. Likewise, the Magistrate Judge declines to award attorneys' fees for either side in this matter. Trial is reset for 2/3/2015. Judge Trauger will issue a separate order concerning her requirements for trial and for the final pretrial conference. As discussed with the parties, all discovery in this matter will be completed by 6/30/2014. Dispositive motions will be due July 28, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 4/25/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) Modified on 4/25/2014 (dt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard v. Earth Solutions, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earth Solutions, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Leonard
Represented By: Kerry E. Knox
Represented By: Amy J. Farrar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]