Pitt Excavating LLC v. Pitt

Plaintiff: Pitt Excavating LLC
Defendant: Mary Lou Pitt
Case Number: 3:2013cv00909
Filed: September 10, 2013
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Sumner
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY TO TAKE THE DEPOSITION OF JOHN W. PITT, II and the CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF PITT EXCAVATING LLC AND TO ALLOW ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS FOR THE PURPOSE OF RESPONDING TO THE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 9/23/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 21, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Verified Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 10/21/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 18, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 12/17/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Text Searchable Version)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
April 30, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 4/29/14. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment - Text Search Memorandum)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
April 30, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In accordance with the Memorandum filed herewith, Plaintiff's motion to alter or amend 70 is GRANTED in part to set aside any award of attorney fees under 28 U. S. C. § 1927, but is otherwise DENIED. Under the Court's inh erent authority, Defendant is AWARDED attorney fees and costs as follows: Jones, Hawkins and Farmer, $20,657.72 and John Phillips $1,718.70. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 4/30/14. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment - Text Search Order) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitt Excavating LLC v. Pitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pitt Excavating LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Pianto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lou Pitt
Represented By: William B. Hawkins, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]