Tanco, et al. v. Haslam, et al.

Defendant: Bill Gibbons, William Edward (Bill) Haslam, Larry Martin and Robert Cooper
Plaintiff: Matthew Mansell, Johno Espejo, Vanessa DeVillez, Kellie Miller, Thomas Kostura, Ijpe DeKoe, Sophy Jesty and Valeria Tanco
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01159
Filed: October 21, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled in this case for January 15, 2014 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following disposition of the pending motions. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 10th day of January 2014. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/10/14. (af)
March 12, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Motion to Ascertain Status of the Case. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/12/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 14, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Martin's Motion to Intervene 57 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/14/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 14, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/14/14. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 14, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 29 is hereby GRANTED. The plaintiffs did not submit a proposed preliminary injunction order for the court's consideration . Therefore, the court has prepared and hereby ISSUES the accompanying Preliminary Injunction, which tracks the language of the relief requested in the plaintiffs' motion itself. (See Docket No. 29 at p. 3.) If either side believes that the language of the injunction should be modified, it may a file a motion for the courts consideration. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/14/14. (dt)
March 14, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/14/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 20, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Therefore, for the reasons stated herein, the Motion to Stay is hereby DENIED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/20/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tanco, et al. v. Haslam, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Gibbons
Represented By: Martha A. Campbell
Represented By: Kevin Gene Steiling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Edward (Bill) Haslam
Represented By: Martha A. Campbell
Represented By: Kevin Gene Steiling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Martin
Represented By: Martha A. Campbell
Represented By: Kevin Gene Steiling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cooper
Represented By: Martha A. Campbell
Represented By: Kevin Gene Steiling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Mansell
Represented By: Phillip F. Cramer
Represented By: John L. Farringer, IV
Represented By: William L. Harbison
Represented By: Scott Hickman
Represented By: Maureen T. Holland
Represented By: Regina M. Lambert
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter
Represented By: Asaf Orr
Represented By: Abby Rose Rubenfeld
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johno Espejo
Represented By: Phillip F. Cramer
Represented By: John L. Farringer, IV
Represented By: William L. Harbison
Represented By: Scott Hickman
Represented By: Maureen T. Holland
Represented By: Regina M. Lambert
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter
Represented By: Asaf Orr
Represented By: Abby Rose Rubenfeld
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa DeVillez
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter
Represented By: Regina M. Lambert
Represented By: Maureen T. Holland
Represented By: Scott Hickman
Represented By: William L. Harbison
Represented By: John L. Farringer, IV
Represented By: Phillip F. Cramer
Represented By: Asaf Orr
Represented By: Abby Rose Rubenfeld
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Miller
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll
Represented By: Abby Rose Rubenfeld
Represented By: Asaf Orr
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter
Represented By: Regina M. Lambert
Represented By: Maureen T. Holland
Represented By: Scott Hickman
Represented By: William L. Harbison
Represented By: John L. Farringer, IV
Represented By: Phillip F. Cramer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kostura
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll
Represented By: Abby Rose Rubenfeld
Represented By: Asaf Orr
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter
Represented By: Regina M. Lambert
Represented By: Maureen T. Holland
Represented By: Scott Hickman
Represented By: William L. Harbison
Represented By: John L. Farringer, IV
Represented By: Phillip F. Cramer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ijpe DeKoe
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll
Represented By: Abby Rose Rubenfeld
Represented By: Asaf Orr
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter
Represented By: Regina M. Lambert
Represented By: Maureen T. Holland
Represented By: Scott Hickman
Represented By: William L. Harbison
Represented By: John L. Farringer, IV
Represented By: Phillip F. Cramer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophy Jesty
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll
Represented By: Abby Rose Rubenfeld
Represented By: Asaf Orr
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter
Represented By: Regina M. Lambert
Represented By: Maureen T. Holland
Represented By: Scott Hickman
Represented By: William L. Harbison
Represented By: John L. Farringer, IV
Represented By: Phillip F. Cramer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeria Tanco
Represented By: Christopher F. Stoll
Represented By: Abby Rose Rubenfeld
Represented By: Asaf Orr
Represented By: Shannon P. Minter
Represented By: Regina M. Lambert
Represented By: Maureen T. Holland
Represented By: Scott Hickman
Represented By: William L. Harbison
Represented By: John L. Farringer, IV
Represented By: Phillip F. Cramer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]