Bankers Standard Insurance Company v. MTD (USA) Corporation et al

Defendant: Zhejiang Dingbo Plumbing Manufacturing Co., Ltd., MTD (USA) Corporation and Interline Brands, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bankers Standard Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01199
Filed: October 31, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Juliet E. Griffin
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
 
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2013 17 Featured Case INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 10/15/2014. Discovery due by 9/1/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 1/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 12/18/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
December 18, 2013 18 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2: Telephone Conference set for 5/7/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin., Jury Trial set for 6/16/2015 at 9:00 AM before Senior Judge John T. Nixon. Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2015 at 10:00 AM bef ore Senior Judge John T. Nixon. Exhibit List and Witness List due by 5/29/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 12/18/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 27, 2014 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to serve process upon defendant Zhejiang Dingbo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 3/27/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 7, 2014 24 Featured Case ORDER: Telephone Conference held on 5/7/2014. Motion to Compel discovery 20 is GRANTED to the extent that defendants MTD and Interline shall have until May 30, 2014, to serve responses to the interrogatories and requests for production served upon them on 12/19/2013. Counsel for the parties shall convene another telephone conference call with the Court on Thursday, 7/24/2014, at 12:00 noon, central time, to address whether defendant Dingbo has entered an appearance or has been served , what experts the parties anticipate, on what dates expert depositions have been scheduled, whether any dispositive motion will be filed, whether any additional parties are expected, whether any scheduling deadlines can or should be adjusted, and any other appropriate matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 5/7/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 7, 2014 26 Featured Case ORDER: Telephone Conference RESET for 7/30/2014 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 7/7/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
July 9, 2014 27 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 294(b), the undersigned is unable or unwilling to undertake this matter. Accordingly, I hereby RECUSE myself and return this case to the Clerk of Court for reassignment to another judge. Case reassigned to Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr. for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 7/8/2014. (ds)
August 1, 2014 28 Featured Case ORDER setting deadlines. The Clerk is directed to forward the file to Chief Judge Haynes for all further proceedings in this case. Because Chief Judge Haynes normally conducts his own case management, unless otherwise directed by the Court, there will be no further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge in this case. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 8/1/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bankers Standard Insurance Company v. MTD (USA) Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Dingbo Plumbing Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTD (USA) Corporation
Represented By: Brian D. Cummings
Represented By: Michael Alva Geracioti
Represented By: Linda A. Nathenson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interline Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D. Cummings
Represented By: Michael Alva Geracioti
Represented By: Linda A. Nathenson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: John W. Reis
Represented By: James A. Freeman, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]