Anarion Investments LLC v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al

Defendant: Brock & Scott, PLLC, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Christiana Trust and Leipzig Living Trust
Plaintiff: Anarion Investments LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2014cv00012
Filed: January 6, 2014
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2014 21 Featured Case ORDER: Given the filing of an Amended Complaint 15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss filed by the defendants on January 27, 2014 10 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/20/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
February 26, 2014 24 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to the Notice of Automatic Stay 23 , it is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED, pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362, against defendant Leipzig Living Trust only. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/26/14. (dt)
March 27, 2014 48 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Motion for Leave to File Extended Brief. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/27/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Anarion Investments LLC v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock & Scott, PLLC
Represented By: Nicholas H. Adler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas H. Adler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiana Trust
Represented By: Nicholas H. Adler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leipzig Living Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anarion Investments LLC
Represented By: Scott D. Johannessen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]