Brooks v. United States VA Administration

Plaintiff: Wanda E. Brooks
Defendant: United States VA Administration
Case Number: 3:2014cv00159
Filed: January 22, 2014
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Kevin H. Sharp
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for service of summons by US Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 6/24/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
September 9, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for the Manual File Tape. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 9/9/2014. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.) (ds)
March 24, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/24/15. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
March 24, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons explained more fully in the Memorandum entered contemporaneously herewith, the court finds that the plaintiff's Objections lack merit. The court agrees with the Magistrate Judge's analysis and recommendations. There fore, the plaintiff's Objections are OVERRULED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to substitute the United States for the "United States VA Administration" as the only defendant to this action. The defendant's motion to dismiss 21 is GRAN TED, and this case is hereby DISMISSED.This order constitutes the judgment in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/24/15. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. United States VA Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda E. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States VA Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]