DDR-SAU Jackson West Towne, L.L.C. v. Peters et al

Defendant: Judy Peters, Nicolaas Peters, Rajesh Aggarwal and Reita Aggarwal
Plaintiff: DDR-SAU Jackson West Towne, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00909
Filed: April 3, 2014
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Williamson
Referring Judge: E. Clifton Knowles
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/6/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on any Defendants who have not yet entered an appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 4/24/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 24, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Initial Case Management Conference currently scheduled for July 1, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby continued and will be reset by a separate Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 6/24/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
July 18, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Nicolas Peters and Judy Peters. Signed by Keith Throckmorton, Clerk of Court on 7/18/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
July 30, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Initial Case Management Conference is set for August 19, 2014, at 11:00 a.m before US Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles. Prior to the hearing, counsel for the parties are directed to confer on a Proposed Case Management Order for the progression of this case, which shall be submitted three (3) days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 7/30/2014. (ds)
July 31, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by District Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/31/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
April 4, 2014 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Within 20 days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order addressing the points discussed above and establishing that the Court does, in fact, have subject matter jurisdiction of this action. Defendants may, b ut are not required to, file a Reply to Plaintiff's Response within 15 days after the filing of Plaintiff's Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 4/4/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DDR-SAU Jackson West Towne, L.L.C. v. Peters et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Peters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolaas Peters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajesh Aggarwal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reita Aggarwal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DDR-SAU Jackson West Towne, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kyle A. Young
Represented By: Charles W. Cook, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]