United States of America v. 2014 Mercedes Benz, bearing VIN 4JGDF2EEXEA286419

Defendant: 2014 Mercedes Benz, bearing VIN 4JGDF2EEXEA286419
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 3:2014cv00969
Filed: April 11, 2014
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to All Person and Entities Except Entourage Group, Inc. Signed by Keith Throckmorton, Clerk of Court on 7/16/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
July 28, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR ADMISSION: This Court finds that Joshua S. Widlansky is currently licensed in good standing to practice law in the State of Tennessee. Now, therefore, Joshua S. Widlansky, is hereby admitted to represent the Claimant, Entourage Group, Inc., in the above styled cause pro hac vice, for the pendency of this action. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/28/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 8, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT as to all persons and entities except Entourage Group, Inc. and Mad Enterprise Group, LLC. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/8/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 8, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motion for Default Judgment as to All Personal and Entities Except Entourage Group, Inc. and Mad Enterprise Group, LLC. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/8/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
August 19, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/19/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 19, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/19/2014. (ds)
August 25, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/25/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
September 4, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Claimant Entourage Group Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum is hereby GRANTED. Claimant shall file their Reply Memorandum on or before September 10, 2014. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/4/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
September 9, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/9/2014. (ds)
April 23, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Nixon on 4/23/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. 2014 Mercedes Benz, bearing VIN 4JGDF2EEXEA286419
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2014 Mercedes Benz, bearing VIN 4JGDF2EEXEA286419
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Debra Teufel Phillips
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]