O Corp Corporation et al v. Royal Appliance Mfg. Company et al

Appellee: Royal Appliance Mfg. Company and OAC Acquisition Company LLC
Appellant: O Merchandising, LLC and O Corp Corporation
Case Number: 3:2014cv01061
Filed: April 25, 2014
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/2/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 20, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Appellants' Motion For Leave to File Reply to Appellees' Sur-Reply is GRANTED, but its request for oral argument, contained within the same filing 20 , is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/20/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
January 14, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Appellants' brief shall be filed by January 26, 2015. The Appellees brief shall be filed by February 9, 2015. The briefs shall not exceed 15 pages in length. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/14/2015. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O Corp Corporation et al v. Royal Appliance Mfg. Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Royal Appliance Mfg. Company
Represented By: Robert J. Welhoelter
Represented By: Gilbert R. Saydah, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce R. Kraus
Represented By: Benjamin D. Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OAC Acquisition Company LLC
Represented By: Benjamin D. Feder
Represented By: Bruce R. Kraus
Represented By: Gilbert R. Saydah, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: O Merchandising, LLC
Represented By: Thor Y. Urness
Represented By: William LaFayette Norton, III
Represented By: Alexandra E. Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: O Corp Corporation
Represented By: Thor Y. Urness
Represented By: William LaFayette Norton, III
Represented By: Alexandra E. Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.