Operating Engineers Local No. 147 Health Fund et al v. Ford Pile Foundations, Inc.

Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local No. 147 Annuity Fund and Operating Engineers Local No. 147 Health Fund
Defendant: Ford Pile Foundations, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2014cv01118
Filed: May 6, 2014
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2014 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Keith Throckmorton, Clerk of Court on 6/30/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
August 20, 2014 14 Featured Case AGREED ORDER: The Clerk is directed to administratively close this civil action, subject to petition of Plaintiffs to reopen in the event the payment plan is not consummated, or in the event Defendant does not conform its conduct to 29 U.S.C. § 1145. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/20/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
June 6, 2014 6 Featured Case ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/25/2014 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/6/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
June 13, 2014 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion to cancel case management conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/13/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Operating Engineers Local No. 147 Health Fund et al v. Ford Pile Foundations, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local No. 147 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Robert Jan Jennings
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local No. 147 Health Fund
Represented By: Robert Jan Jennings
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Pile Foundations, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]