Humphrey v. Justo

Plaintiff: Tyrone Humphrey
Defendant: David Justo
Case Number: 3:2014cv01187
Filed: May 16, 2014
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: John T. Nixon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Clerk will consolidate the cases. Case 3:14-1188 will be termed as MOOT and all further filings in this matter should be done in the lead case, Case 3:14-1187. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 7/30/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
August 4, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The Jury Trial is set for 9/15/2015 at 9:00 AM, the Pretrial Conference is set for 8/24/2015 at 10:00 AM, and a Telephone Conference is set for 12/15/2014 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. Discovery due by 3 /21/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2015. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for all other deadlines and information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 8/4/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ds)
September 11, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting (for time requested) 18 Motion for Leave to File Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Out of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/11/2014. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey v. Justo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Humphrey
Represented By: Josette Michelle Chambers
Represented By: Christine Cane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Justo
Represented By: John Thomas Feeney, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]