Calaway v. Schucker

Case Number: 2:2002cv02715
Filed: September 13, 2002
Court: Tennessee Western District Court
Office: Memphis Office
Presiding Judge: S. Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Charmiane G. Claxton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2013 404 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 272 MOTION in Limine #1 To Preclude Plaintiff from Disclosing a Dollar Demand to the Jury or Jury Venire and to Preclude Improper Arguments Regarding the Valuation of This Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 01/25/2013. (Claxton, Charmiane)
March 12, 2013 405 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER terminating 307 , 311 , 355 based upon resolution at 12/14/2012 Status Conference; denying 343 Motion in Limine; denying 345 Motion in Limine; granting 346 Motion in Limine; granting 347 Motion in Limine; granting in part and de nying in part 348 Motion in Limine; denying 349 Motion in Limine; denying 350 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 351 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 354 Motion to Extend Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 03/12/2013. (Claxton, Charmiane)
March 12, 2013 406 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER terminating 262 , 263 , 274 based upon withdrawal at the 12/14/2012 Status Conference; denying 152 Motion to Strike; denying 254 Motion to Compel; denying 258 Motion in Limine; granting 259 Motion in Limine; granting 261 Motion in Limine; denying 264 Motion in Limine; granting 265 Motion in Limine; denying 266 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 03/12/2013. (Claxton, Charmiane)
March 12, 2013 407 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 271 , 287 Motion to Disqualify and to Strike Experts Retained by Baker and Whitt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 03/12/2013. (Claxton, Charmiane)
March 25, 2013 410 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 409 Motion to Clarify the Court's Ruling on Defendant's Motion in Limine #5 to Preclude Testimony Concerning Gender or Racial Discrimination Encountered by Helen Barnes, M.D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 03/25/2013. (Claxton, Charmiane)
August 20, 2013 493 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 457 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 8/20/2013. (Claxton, Charmiane)
August 22, 2013 496 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Pretrial Matters. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 8/22/13. (Anderson, S.)
November 8, 2013 540 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 533 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/8/13. (Anderson, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calaway v. Schucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.