B.E. Technology, L.L.C. v. LinkedIn Corporation Featured Case

Defendant: LinkedIn Corporation
Plaintiff: B.E. Technology, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2012cv02772
Filed: September 7, 2012
Court: Tennessee Western District Court
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Diane K. Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2012 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Hsiang Hong Lin on behalf of B.E. Technology, L.L.C. (Lin, Hsiang)
October 12, 2012 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Qudus B. Olaniran on behalf of B.E. Technology, L.L.C. (Olaniran, Qudus)
October 11, 2012 10 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,628,314;. (jml)
October 10, 2012 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Edward Freitas on behalf of B.E. Technology, L.L.C. (Freitas, Robert)
October 2, 2012 8 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,628,314; . (Freitas, Robert)
September 18, 2012 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Calhoun Simpson on behalf of B.E. Technology, L.L.C. (Simpson, Adam)
September 18, 2012 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Carter on behalf of B.E. Technology, L.L.C. (Carter, Richard)
September 13, 2012 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by B.E. Technology, L.L.C.. (Freitas, Robert)
September 10, 2012 4 Notice of Correction to 1 Complaint Signature Page. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaufman, Craig)
September 10, 2012 3 Summons Issued as to LinkedIn Corporation. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 7, 2012 2 Chief Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
September 7, 2012 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against LinkedIn Corporation (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0651-1553517), filed by B.E. Technology, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Kaufman, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B.E. Technology, L.L.C. v. LinkedIn Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LinkedIn Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.E. Technology, L.L.C.
Represented By: Richard M. Carter
Represented By: Craig Robert Kaufman
Represented By: Adam Calhoun Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]