Burton v. City of Memphis et al

Defendant: A.C. Wharton, Memphis Police Department, James A. Walton and City of Memphis
Plaintiff: Cynthia M.P. Burton
Case Number: 2:2013cv02070
Filed: February 1, 2013
Court: Tennessee Western District Court
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Referring Judge: Charmiane G. Claxton
Presiding Judge: James D. Todd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 7 , ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL AND ORDER CERTIFYING AN INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL WOULD NOT BE TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 10/31/13. (Todd, James)
November 7, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment and 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Objections to R&R due by 11/21/2014. ORDER DENYING 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 11/07/2014. (Claxton, Charmiane)
November 26, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT DEFENDANT'S 22 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENY PLAINTIFF'S 27 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, CERTIFYING AN APPEAL WOULD NOT BE TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH, AND DENYING LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 11/26/14. (Todd, James)
October 10, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Issue and Effect Service of Process; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on In Forma Pauperis Screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915 and on Certification of Appealability pursuant to Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Objections to R&R due by 10/24/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 10/10/2013. (Claxton, Charmiane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. City of Memphis et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.C. Wharton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memphis Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Walton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Memphis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia M.P. Burton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]