Jones, Et Al v. Halliburton Company et al Featured Case

Plaintiff worked at Camp Hope in Baghdad, Iraq. She alleges that employees at Halliburton Company and Kellogg Brown & Root sexually harassed her, retaliated against her when she complained and also sexually assaulted her. Furthermore, she also alleges that the Defendants were aware of the hostile work environment and were negligent in hiring and supervising its employees, providing a safe working environment, and providing a safe living environment.

Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root, S. de R.L., Kellogg Brown & Root (KBR), Inc., KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., The United States of America, Halliburton Company, KBR Technical Services, Inc, Overseas Administrative Services, LTD, Eric Iler, Charles Boartz, Unknown Parties, Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root International, Inc. and Kellogg Brown & Root LLC
Plaintiff: Joseph Daigle and Jamie Leigh Jones
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv00295
Filed: May 16, 2007
 
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Beaumont Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Thad Heartfield
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2007 32 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT by the SD/TX, Houston Division of order of transfer and docket sheet on 8/14/07 and assigned case number 07-2719. (bjc, )
August 13, 2007 Interdistrict transfer to the Southern District of TX, Houston Division. Mailed certified copies of order of transfer and docket sheet. (bjc, )
July 24, 2007 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion to Change Venue. Ordered that this action is transferred to the Houston Division of the Southern District of Texas pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) for the convenience of parties and witnesses and in the interest of justice. Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 7/24/07. (bjc, )
July 12, 2007 30 Featured Case ORDER granting 29 Motion for leave to withdraw the 27 motion to deem admissions. Ordered that the clerk is directed to terminate the 27 Motion to deem admisions . Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 7/12/07. (bjc, )
July 11, 2007 29 MOTION to Withdraw motion for deemed admissions by Joseph Daigle, Jamie Leigh Jones. (Kelly, Lannie)
July 11, 2007 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re 27 MOTION to deem admissions filed by Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root, S. de R.L., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Corporation, Inc, KBR Technical Services, Inc, Overseas Administrative Services, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sloan, Shadow)
July 9, 2007 27 MOTION to deem admissions by Joseph Daigle, Jamie Leigh Jones. (Kelly, Lannie) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2007 (bjc, ).
June 27, 2007 26 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executedas to United States of America by serving US Attorney General on 6/14/07 (bjc, )
June 27, 2007 25 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Overseas Administrative Services Ltd by serving the Secretary of State on 6/7/07 (bjc, )
June 27, 2007 24 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed as toEric Iler served on 5/31/2007, answer due 6/20/2007. (bjc, )
June 25, 2007 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root, S. de R.L., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services Corporation, Inc, KBR Technical Services, Inc, Overseas Administrative Services, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Christ, Vanetta)
June 20, 2007 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Joseph Daigle, Jamie Leigh Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A# 3Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D)(Kelly, Lannie) Modified on 6/20/2007 (bjc, ).
June 11, 2007 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 19, answer to amended complaint. Atty filed twice, see doc# 20. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (bjc, )
June 11, 2007 21 MOTION to Change Venue by Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root, S. de R.L., Halliburton Company, KBR, Inc., KBR Technical Services, Inc, Overseas Administrative Services, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6# 2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Christ, Vanetta)
June 11, 2007 20 Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by KBR, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root, S. de R.L., Halliburton Company, KBR Technical Services, Inc, Overseas Administrative Services, LTD.(Sloan, Shadow)
June 11, 2007 19 ***ATTY FILED TWICE. SEE DOC# 20.*** Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root, S. de R.L., Kellogg Brown & Root (KBR), Inc., Halliburton Company, KBR Technical Services, Inc, Overseas Administrative Services, LTD.(Sloan, Shadow) Modified on 6/12/2007 (bjc, ).
May 31, 2007 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued and mailed to pla's atty for service as to Eric Iler on 2nd amended complaint. (bjc, )
May 31, 2007 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned personally executed as to Halliburton Company served on 5/22/2007 on complaint, answer due 6/11/2007. (bjc, )
May 31, 2007 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned personally executed as to KBR Technical Services, Inc served on 5/29/2007 on amended complaint, answer due 6/18/2007. (bjc, )
May 31, 2007 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned personally executed as to Kellogg Brown & Root (KBR), Inc. served on 5/29/2007 on amended complaint, answer due 6/18/2007. (bjc, )
May 31, 2007 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned personally executed as to Kellogg Brown & Root, S. de R.L. served on 5/29/2007 on amended complaint, answer due 6/18/2007. (bjc, )
May 31, 2007 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned personally executed as to Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc. served on 5/29/2007 on amended complaint, answer due 6/18/2007. (bjc, )
May 31, 2007 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned personally executed as to The United States of America served on 5/29/2007 on complaint, answer due 6/18/2007. (bjc, )
May 31, 2007 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned personally executed as to Kellogg Brown & Root International, Inc. served on 5/29/2007 amended complaint, answer due 6/18/2007. (bjc, )
May 31, 2007 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned personally executed as to Kellogg Brown & Root LLC served on 5/29/2007 on amended complaint, answer due 6/18/2007. (bjc, )
May 31, 2007 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned personally executed as to Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc served on 5/29/2007 on amended complaint, answer due 6/18/2007. (bjc, )
May 31, 2007 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned personally executed as to KBR Technical Services, Inc served on 5/22/2007 on complaint. (bjc, )
May 30, 2007 7 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Joseph Daigle, Jamie Leigh Jones.(Kelly, Lannie)
May 29, 2007 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued and mailed to pla's atty for service as to Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root International, Inc., Kellogg Brown & Root LLC, Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc, Kellogg Brown & Root, S. de R.L., Kellogg Brown & Root (KBR), Inc., KBR Technical Services, Inc. (bjc, )
May 24, 2007 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Joseph Daigle, Jamie Leigh Jones.(Kelly, Lannie)
May 21, 2007 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued and handed to pla's atty for service as to The United States of America, Kellogg Brown & Root Services Corporation, Inc, KBR Technical Services, Inc. (bjc, )
May 17, 2007 3 Magistrate Consent Form electronically sent to attorneys for all plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Clerk's Notice to Attorneys) (pkb, )
May 16, 2007 2 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Charles Boartz, Halliburton Company, Overseas Administrative Services, LTD. (pkb, )
May 16, 2007 Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 1-1-4139 (pkb, )
May 16, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350 paid, receipt # 1-1-4139.) filed by Jamie Leigh Jones, Joseph Daigle. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pkb, ) Modified on 5/17/2007 (pkb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jones, Et Al v. Halliburton Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root, S. de R.L.
Represented By: Shadow Sloan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root (KBR), Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBR, Inc.
Represented By: Shadow Sloan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root Services, Inc.
Represented By: Shadow Sloan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Company
Represented By: Shadow Sloan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBR Technical Services, Inc
Represented By: Shadow Sloan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overseas Administrative Services, LTD
Represented By: Shadow Sloan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Iler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Boartz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc
Represented By: Morris C Carrington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root International, Inc.
Represented By: Shadow Sloan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Brown & Root LLC
Represented By: Shadow Sloan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Daigle
Represented By: Paul F Waldner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Leigh Jones
Represented By: Paul F Waldner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]