CpuMate Inc et al v Apple Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff: Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd and CpuMate Inc
Defendant: Apple Inc
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00269
Filed: April 11, 2013
 
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Marshall Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2014 111 NOTICE by G B T Inc of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Potts, Heather)
April 10, 2014 110 NOTICE by Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Fountain, Aaron)
April 10, 2014 109 NOTICE by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Huff, Winston)
April 10, 2014 108 NOTICE by Cooler Master Co Ltd, Cooler Master USA Inc of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Lee, Sang)
April 3, 2014 107 NOTICE of Change of Address by Aaron Gabriel Fountain (Fountain, Aaron)
April 2, 2014 106 Featured Case ORDER granting 64 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rickey Lawrence Faulkner and Stayton L Worthington terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/2/14. (mrm, )
April 1, 2014 105 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Carrie L Williamson on behalf of Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4593349. (Williamson, Carrie)
March 26, 2014 104 NOTICE by G B T Inc of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-1 (Potts, Heather)
March 25, 2014 103 NOTICE by Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation of Compliance with PR 4-1 Disclosures (Fountain, Aaron)
March 25, 2014 102 NOTICE by Cooler Master Co Ltd, Cooler Master USA Inc of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Lee, Sang)
March 25, 2014 101 NOTICE by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd Of Compliance With P.R. 4-1 (Jagai, Deborah)
March 21, 2014 100 NOTICE by G B T Inc of Compliance with P.R. 3-4 Disclosures (Potts, Heather)
March 21, 2014 99 NOTICE by Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation of Compliance with PR 3-4 Disclosures (Fountain, Aaron)
March 21, 2014 98 NOTICE by Cooler Master Co Ltd, Cooler Master USA Inc of Compliance re Service of P.R.3-4 Document Production (Newton, Michael)
March 13, 2014 97 Featured Case ORDER granting 96 Stipulation of Dismissal. Dft Apple Inc is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2014. (ch, )
March 12, 2014 96 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rahebi, Bita)
March 11, 2014 95 Featured Case ORDER denying 91 Motion to Stay Deadlines. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/11/14. (mrm, )
March 11, 2014 94 NOTICE by G B T Inc of compliance with P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions (Potts, Heather)
March 10, 2014 93 NOTICE by Cooler Master Co Ltd, Cooler Master USA Inc Compliance P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions (Newton, Michael)
March 10, 2014 92 NOTICE by Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation of Compliance - PR 3-3 Invalidity Contentions (Fountain, Aaron)
March 10, 2014 91 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Stay Deadlines)(Rahebi, Bita)
March 10, 2014 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Liu on behalf of Cooler Master Co Ltd, Cooler Master USA Inc (Liu, Jennifer)
March 10, 2014 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sang Lee on behalf of Cooler Master Co Ltd, Cooler Master USA Inc (Lee, Sang)
March 7, 2014 88 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer to Amended Complaint, Cooler Master Co., Ltd. Counterclaim ) by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd.(Huff, Winston)
February 18, 2014 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yitai Hu on behalf of Cooler Master USA Inc (Hu, Yitai)
February 14, 2014 86 Featured Case ORDER granting 83 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/14/2014. (ch, )
February 14, 2014 85 Featured Case ORDER granting 82 Sealed Motion for Leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/14/2014. (ch, )
February 13, 2014 84 Featured Case ORDER granting 81 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven W Flanders terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/12/14. (mrm, )
February 13, 2014 83 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 82 Unopposed SEALED MOTION For Leave To Amend Complaint in 2:13-cv-00348 by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
February 13, 2014 82 Unopposed SEALED MOTION For Leave To Amend Complaint in 2:13-cv-00348 by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
February 10, 2014 81 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Steven Flanders by G B T Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boyd, Karen)
February 6, 2014 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather Lynn Potts on behalf of G B T Inc (Potts, Heather)
January 30, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 7/3/2014 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
January 29, 2014 79 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Dft Giga-Byte Technology Co. Ltd is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/28/2014. (ch, )
January 27, 2014 78 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
January 27, 2014 77 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by G B T Inc, Giga-Byte Technology Co Ltd of Taipei Taiwan (Flanders, Steven)
January 27, 2014 76 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc Apple Inc.'s Notice of Disclosure under Paragraph 1 of the Discovery Order (Albritton, Eric)
January 27, 2014 75 NOTICE by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd of Compliance with Initial Disclosure (Huff, Winston)
January 27, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 74, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 27, 2014 74 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd of Compliance with Orders and Service of Initial Disclosures to Defendants (Huff, Winston) Modified on 1/27/2014 (ch, ).
January 24, 2014 73 NOTICE by Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Fountain, Aaron)
January 24, 2014 72 NOTICE by Cooler Master Co Ltd, Cooler Master USA Inc Notice of Compliance regarding Service of Initial Disclosures (Mehta, Shivan)
January 24, 2014 71 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/24/2014. (nkl, )
January 24, 2014 70 NOTICE of Change of Address by Karen I Boyd (Boyd, Karen)
January 24, 2014 69 Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd. (Huff, Winston)
January 21, 2014 68 Featured Case DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 4/17/2014., Markman Hearing set for 7/3/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions due by 1/14/2015., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/19/2015., Jury Selection set for 2/9/2015 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Mediation deadline is 7/31/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/20/2014. (ch, )
January 21, 2014 67 Featured Case DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/20/2014. (ch, )
January 17, 2014 66 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, David Folsom, filed by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd. (For Parties in Consolidated Case 2:13-cv-00269). (Huff, Winston)
January 17, 2014 65 Submission of JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AGREED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd (For Parties in Consolidated Case 2:13-cv-00269). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Discovery Order)(Huff, Winston)
January 6, 2014 64 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Termination of Electronic Notices by G B T Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Worthington, Stayton)
January 3, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 1/3/14. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Court's scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. (Court Reporter Carla Sims, CSR.)(jml)
January 3, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 1/3/14. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Courts scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. (Court Reporter Carla Sims.) (bga, )
January 2, 2014 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by G B T Inc (Boyd, Karen)
December 31, 2013 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven W Flanders on behalf of G B T Inc (Flanders, Steven)
December 31, 2013 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karen I Boyd on behalf of G B T Inc (Boyd, Karen)
December 20, 2013 60 NOTICE by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd re 52 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Giga-Byte Technology Co. Ltd. and G.B.T. Inc.) (Huff, Winston)
December 20, 2013 59 NOTICE by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd re 52 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Cooler Master Co. LTD. and Cooler Master USA Inc.) (Huff, Winston)
December 20, 2013 58 NOTICE by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd re 52 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Toshiba Corp. and Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. (Huff, Winston)
December 20, 2013 57 NOTICE by CpuMate Inc re 52 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Huff, Winston)
December 19, 2013 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Alexander Latchford on behalf of Apple Inc (Latchford, Shawn)
December 19, 2013 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shivan V Mehta on behalf of Cooler Master USA Inc (Mehta, Shivan)
December 16, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER granting 53 Motion to Stay deadlines for NZXT, Inc. up to and including 12/24/13. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/16/13. (bas, )
December 9, 2013 53 Agreed MOTION to Stay ALL DEADLINES FOR DEFENDANT NZXT, INC. by CpuMate Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
December 4, 2013 52 Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/3/2013. (ch, )
November 18, 2013 51 Featured Case ORDER granting 47 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines in this matter are stayed up to and including December 9, 2013 for NZXT, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/18/13. (ehs, )
November 14, 2013 50 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION for Sanctions of the Defendant Dell, Inc., filed by CpuMate Inc. (Huff, Winston)
November 12, 2013 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Denali Intermediate Inc. for Dell Inc.. (Dacus, Deron)
November 11, 2013 48 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 33 Opposed MOTION to Sever or Removed from Consolidated Actions filed by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd. (Huff, Winston)
November 8, 2013 47 Agreed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines for Defendant NZXT, Inc. by CpuMate Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
November 7, 2013 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Aaron Kerr on behalf of Dell Inc. (Kerr, Peter)
November 4, 2013 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Dell Inc.. (Dacus, Deron)
October 31, 2013 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re 33 Opposed MOTION to Sever or Removed from Consolidated Actions filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Declaration of Alex S. Yap In Support of Apple Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of Motion to be Removed From Consolidated Actions or to Sever, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Yap Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Yap Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Yap Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Yap Declaration)(Rahebi, Bita)
October 25, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for NZXT Corporation to 11/18/2013. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 25, 2013 43 Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (for Defendant NZXT, Inc.) re CpuMate Inc.( Huff, Winston)
October 23, 2013 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION for Sanctions by Dell Inc. filed by CpuMate Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Winston Oliver Huff ("Huff Decl.), # 2 Exhibit A to Huff Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Huff Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Huff Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Huff Decl., # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
October 21, 2013 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 Opposed MOTION to Sever or Removed from Consolidated Actions filed by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
October 18, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER denying 38 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Sur-Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/18/2013. (ch, )
October 14, 2013 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Sur-Reply In Support of Its Motion to Transfer Venue filed by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
October 11, 2013 38 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Sur-Reply In Support of Its Motion to Transfer by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rahebi, Bita) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2013: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
October 9, 2013 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
October 9, 2013 36 MOTION for Sanctions by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Michael Woods, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
October 9, 2013 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David Billow on behalf of G B T Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4351935. (Billow, David)
October 7, 2013 34 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION to Change Venue filed by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd. (Huff, Winston)
October 2, 2013 33 Opposed MOTION to Sever or Removed from Consolidated Actions by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Aple Inc.'s Motion to be Removed from Consolidated Actions or to Sever)(Rahebi, Bita)
September 30, 2013 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Saori Kaji on behalf of Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation (Kaji, Saori)
September 30, 2013 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gerald T Sekimura on behalf of Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation (Sekimura, Gerald)
September 30, 2013 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Cheung on behalf of Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation (Cheung, Katherine)
September 30, 2013 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark D Fowler on behalf of Toshiba America Information Systems Inc, Toshiba Corporation (Fowler, Mark)
September 27, 2013 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Apple Inc. (Rahebi, Bita)
September 27, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 27, Response in support. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
September 27, 2013 27 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE in Support re 19 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Apple Inc. (Rahebi, Bita) Modified on 9/27/2013 (sm, ).
September 27, 2013 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toshiba America Information Systems Inc identifying Corporate Parent Toshiba Corporation, Corporate Parent Toshiba America, Inc. for Toshiba America Information Systems Inc. (Fountain, Aaron)
September 27, 2013 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toshiba Corporation (Fountain, Aaron)
September 27, 2013 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint filed in Case No. 2:13-cv-352); Demand for Jury Trial by Toshiba America Information Systems Inc.(Fountain, Aaron)
September 27, 2013 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint filed in Case No. 2:13-cv-352); Demand for Jury Trial by Toshiba Corporation.(Fountain, Aaron)
September 16, 2013 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Change Venue filed by CpuMate, CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
September 6, 2013 21 Featured Case CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:13-cv-269. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/6/2013. (ch, )
September 4, 2013 20 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 19 MOTION to Change Venue .. (Yap, Alex)
September 2, 2013 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: The Scheduling Conference previously set on September 5, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELLED and will be rescheduled at a later date. (jml)
August 30, 2013 19 MOTION to Change Venue by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alex S. Yap in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Alex S. Yap in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Frank Liang in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Buckley in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer)(Rahebi, Bita) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2013: # 5 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
August 23, 2013 18 NOTICE by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Huff, Winston)
July 31, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/5/2013 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
July 22, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 8/8/2013 01:15 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/13. (bas, )
June 19, 2013 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Apple Inc (Albritton, Eric)
June 17, 2013 15 ANSWER to 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd.(Huff, Winston)
June 6, 2013 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Apple Inc. (Rahebi, Bita)
June 6, 2013 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc (Rahebi, Bita)
June 6, 2013 12 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd by Apple Inc.(Rahebi, Bita)
May 3, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc to 6/6/2013. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 3, 2013 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.( Yap, Alex)
May 3, 2013 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alex S Yap on behalf of Apple Inc (Yap, Alex)
May 3, 2013 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bita Rahebi on behalf of Apple Inc (Rahebi, Bita)
May 3, 2013 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Belusko on behalf of Apple Inc (Belusko, Vincent)
April 25, 2013 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CpuMate Inc, Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd. Apple Inc served on 4/16/2013, answer due 5/7/2013. (ehs, )
April 12, 2013 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc. (ehs, )
April 12, 2013 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ehs, )
April 12, 2013 Judge Rodney Gilstrap added. (ehs, )
April 11, 2013 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CpuMate Inc., Golden Sun News Techniques Co., Ltd.. (Huff, Winston)
April 11, 2013 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah Jagai on behalf of CpuMate Inc., Golden Sun News Techniques Co., Ltd. (Jagai, Deborah)
April 11, 2013 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Huff, Winston)
April 11, 2013 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CpuMate Inc., Golden Sun News Techniques Co., Ltd. (Huff, Winston)
April 11, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4089072.), filed by CpuMate Inc., Golden Sun News Techniques Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A)(Huff, Winston)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: CpuMate Inc et al v Apple Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Sun News Techniques Co Ltd
Represented By: Deborah Jagai
Represented By: Winston Oliver Huff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CpuMate Inc
Represented By: Deborah Jagai
Represented By: Winston Oliver Huff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Vincent J Belusko
Represented By: Bita Rahebi
Represented By: Alex S Yap
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]