Innovative Display Technologies LLC v. Acer Inc. et al

Defendant: Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation
Plaintiff: Innovative Display Technologies LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv00522
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 08/26/2014. (nkl, )
June 19, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/19/2014. (ch, )
July 11, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/11/2014. (nkl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Display Technologies LLC v. Acer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer Inc.
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer America Corporation
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Display Technologies LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Ray Bragalone
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Conroy
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Thomas William Kennedy, Jr
Represented By: Justin Bryce Kimble
Represented By: Daniel Fletcher Olejko
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.