Payne et al v. Apple Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Alyce R Payne, William French, Karen Michaels and Lorna Harris
Defendant: Apple Inc. and AT&T Mobility LLC
Case Number: 4:2009cv00042
Filed: January 29, 2009
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Collin
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Don D. Bush
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2009 Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 5:09cv3353, filed 7/23/2009. (baf, )
July 21, 2009 Interdistrict ELECTRONIC transfer to the NORTHERN District of CALIFORNIA. (baf, )
July 21, 2009 21 MDL TRANSFER ORDER - transferring case to the Northern District of California, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable James Ware. (baf, )
July 6, 2009 20 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1407 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 15, 2009 19 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 18 Motion to Stay Proceedings. The case is STAYED until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 4/15/2009. (baf, )
April 14, 2009 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Don Gale Rushing terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 04/14/09. (Mazzant, Amos)
April 14, 2009 18 Emergency MOTION to Stay by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
April 8, 2009 17 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amos L Mazzant. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/8/2009. (baf, )
April 8, 2009 Case REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Amos L Mazzant. Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush no longer assigned to the case. (baf, )
April 8, 2009 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. (Siebman, Clyde)
April 8, 2009 15 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Don G. Rushing by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
March 27, 2009 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Apple Inc. (Siebman, Clyde)
March 11, 2009 13 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Second Supplemental Filing Relating to Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rushing, Don)
March 11, 2009 12 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Supplemental Filing Relating to Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rushing, Don)
March 11, 2009 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding document number 11 submitted by Apple Inc. A certificate of service was not included. Correction should be made within one business day. (mfr, )
March 11, 2009 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding document number 10 submitted by Apple Inc. A certificate of service was not included. Correction should be made within one business day. (mfr, )
March 11, 2009 11 FILED IN ERROR. Attorney will refile to include certificate of service. NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Second Supplemental Filing Relating to Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rushing, Don) Modified on 3/11/2009 (mfr, ).
March 10, 2009 10 FILED IN ERROR. Attorney will refile document to include certificate of service. NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 8 Notice (Other) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL FILING RELATING TO MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1407 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Revised Schedule A to MDL Petition, # 2 Exhibit B - Revised POS)(Rushing, Don) Modified on 3/11/2009 (mfr, ).
March 5, 2009 9 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC of Filing of Motion for Section 1407 Transfer of Actions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion of AT&T Mobility LLC for Section 1407 Transfer of Actions, # 2 Exhibit Brief of AT&T Mobility LLC in Support of Motion for Section 1407 Transfer of Actions, # 3 Exhibit Schedule of Actions, # 4 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Gavin, Timothy)
March 5, 2009 8 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Filing of Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1407 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rushing, Don)
February 26, 2009 7 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Don Gale Rushing for Apple Inc. (FEE PAID). (baf, )
February 25, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 4/24/2009; AT&T Mobility LLC to 4/24/2009.( baf, )
February 23, 2009 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Apple Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order). Modified on 2/24/2009 (mfr, ).
January 30, 2009 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC. (baf, )
January 30, 2009 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc.. (baf, )
January 29, 2009 3 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Don Bush pursuant to a Standing Order. (baf, )
January 29, 2009 2 Magistrate Consent Form and Notice of Case Assignment sent electronically to Alyce R Payne, William French, Karen Michaels, Lorna Harris (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Case Assignment) (baf, )
January 29, 2009 Case ASSIGNED to Judge Michael H. Schneider. (baf, )
January 29, 2009 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000001855937.), filed by Alyce R Payne, William French, Karen Michaels, Lorna Harris. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Claxton, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne et al v. Apple Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyce R Payne
Represented By: Roger F Claxton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William French
Represented By: Roger F Claxton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Michaels
Represented By: Roger F Claxton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorna Harris
Represented By: Roger F Claxton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]