Harris et al v. Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.

Plaintiff: Doug Harris and Diana Harris
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.
 
Case Number: 4:2010cv00708
Filed: December 27, 2010
 
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Sherman Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2011 49 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 25 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P., 44 Report and Recommendations. Defendants Motion for Partial Dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Dkt. #25) is GRANTED and the fraud claim is dismissed. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/12/11. (cm, )
December 22, 2010 4 Featured Case Memorandum Opinion and Order: The court hereby transfers this action to the Sherman Division of the Eastern District of Texas. (See Order) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 12/22/2010) (dnc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/27/2010.]
August 11, 2011 54 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 51 Report and Recommendations, 36 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #36) isDENIED without prejudice to refiling sixty days from the signing of this Memorandum. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/10/11. (cm, )
January 25, 2012 68 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 56 Motion to Dismiss filed by Doug Harris, Diana Harris, 63 Report and Recommendations,. It is, therefore, ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice (Dkt. #56)is GRANTED and the case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/25/12. (cm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Harris et al v. Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Harris
Represented By: Windle Turley
Represented By: T Nguyen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Harris
Represented By: T Nguyen
Represented By: Windle Turley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.
Represented By: Jamie Lavergne Bryan
Represented By: Kelly Russell Cope
Represented By: Charles William Fillmore
Represented By: Jeffrey C King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]