VanHauen v. American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kay VanHauen
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv00461
Filed: July 25, 2011
 
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Sherman Office
County: Denton
Referring Judge: Amos L. Mazzant
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2012 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 23 Report and Recommendations, DENYING 13 Motion to Change Venue, filed by American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/5/2012. (baf, )
January 20, 2012 29 Featured Case ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN WRONG CASE BY CLERK***AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant on 1/20/2012. (baf, ) Modified on 1/20/2012 (baf, ).
March 14, 2012 41 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 28 Motion to Dismiss, 39 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/14/2012. (pad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: VanHauen v. American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay VanHauen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Kurt Michael Wolber
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]