Davis v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company

Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Virginia Davis
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00710
Filed: November 9, 2012
 
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Sherman Office
County: Hopkins
Referring Judge: Don D. Bush
Presiding Judge: Richard A. Schell
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Virginia Davis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 1/25/2013. (pad, )
September 30, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 18 Report and Recommendation 9 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Virginia Davis. Plaintiff's Motion for Remand (Dkt. 9) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/30/2013. (kls, )
September 28, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 53 Report and Recommendation 28 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. This court is of the opinion that the findings and conclusions of the Magistrate Judge are correct and adopts the Magistrate Judge's report as the findings and conclusions of the court. Therefore, Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 28) is GRANTED and Plaintiff Virginia Davis shall take nothing by her claims against Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 9/28/2014. (kls, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Davis v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Jesse M Coleman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]