Ericsson Inc. et al v. Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., et al Featured Case

Defendant: Samsung Telecommunications America LLP, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ericsson Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson
Case Number: 6:2012cv00894
Filed: November 27, 2012
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Tyler Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2014 78 Featured Case ORDER granting 77 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. All claims, counterclaims, and any other requests for relief asserted by any party in this action are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/29/14. (mjc, )
January 28, 2014 77 Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
January 9, 2014 76 RESPONSE to 72 Response to Non-Motion (ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANT SAMSUNG'S RESPONSE TO ERICSSON'S ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO SAMSUNG'S THIRD AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS) by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Stevenson, Theodore)
December 23, 2013 75 NOTICE by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson NTOICE REGARDING SERVICE OF PR 3-3 AND 3-4 DISCLOSURES (Stevenson, Theodore)
December 23, 2013 74 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP of Compliance (Mukerji, Indranil)
December 20, 2013 73 MOTION Issuance of a Letter of Request for Documents in France Pursuant to the Hague Evidence Convention by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - ETSI Letter of Request, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Earle, Robert)
December 16, 2013 72 RESPONSE to 67 Answer to Counterclaim,,, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP. (Mukerji, Indranil)
December 16, 2013 71 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Stevenson, Theodore)
December 13, 2013 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristina Scurry Baehr on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Baehr, Kristina)
December 13, 2013 69 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., [Samsung's Damages Statement] (Higer, David)
December 13, 2013 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laurie LaVigna Fitzgerald on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Fitzgerald, Laurie)
November 22, 2013 67 ANSWER to 64 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP by Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericsson Inc..(Stevenson, Theodore)
November 18, 2013 66 RESPONSE to 61 Response to Answer and Counterclaim by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Stevenson, Theodore)
November 15, 2013 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kristina Hendricks on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4406650. (Hendricks, Kristina)
November 5, 2013 64 Third Amended ANSWER to Complaint First Amended, COUNTERCLAIM against Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLP, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,.(Mukerji, Indranil)
November 4, 2013 63 Featured Case ORDER granting 62 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/04/13. (mll, )
October 30, 2013 62 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Samsung's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Its Third Amended Answer and Counterclaims and to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Correction for U.S. Patent No. 8,498,255, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Higer, David)
October 25, 2013 61 RESPONSE to 57 Answer to Counterclaim,,, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP. (Mukerji, Indranil)
October 18, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER granting 58 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/18/13. (mll, )
October 16, 2013 59 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., (Higer, David)
October 15, 2013 58 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 50 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
September 30, 2013 57 ANSWER to 53 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP by Ericsson Inc..(Stevenson, Theodore)
September 19, 2013 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., (Gardner, Allen)
September 17, 2013 55 NOTICE by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson NOTICE REGARDING SERVICE OF PR 3-1 AND 3-2 DISCLOSURES (Stevenson, Theodore)
September 14, 2013 54 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., (Patent Local Rule 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures) (Higer, David)
September 13, 2013 53 AMENDED ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Samsung Telecommunications America LLP, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Mukerji, Indranil)
August 28, 2013 52 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Stevenson, Theodore)
August 28, 2013 51 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., DEFENDANTS/COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. AND SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLC'S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE (Higer, David)
June 27, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Mediator. David Folsom is appointed as Mediator in this cause. (mll, )
June 27, 2013 50 Featured Case DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 1/31/2014. Judge David Folsom is appointed as mediator in this cause. Jury Selection set for 2/1/2016 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 7/31/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/26/13. (mll, )
June 27, 2013 49 Featured Case JOINT AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/26/13. (mll, )
June 27, 2013 48 Featured Case JOINT AGREED DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/26/13. (mll, )
June 26, 2013 47 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/26/13. (mll, )
June 26, 2013 NOTICE Status Conference set for 6/27/2013 01:30 PM is CANCELLED. (cwk)
June 25, 2013 46 NOTICE by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson NOTICE OF AGREEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Stevenson, Theodore)
June 13, 2013 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew R Kopsidas on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP (Kopsidas, Andrew)
June 10, 2013 44 RESPONSE to 36 Answer to Counterclaim ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANT SAMSUNG'S RESPONSE TO ERICSSON'S ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO SAMSUNG'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Stevenson, Theodore)
June 7, 2013 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Freeman on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4172637. (Freeman, Christopher)
May 30, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER setting Status Conference for 6/27/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/30/13. (mll, )
May 20, 2013 41 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 40 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss ONLY SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLP, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 21 filed by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. Samsung Telecommunications America LLP, terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/20/2013. (gsg)
May 17, 2013 40 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss ONLY SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLP, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 21 by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
May 17, 2013 39 NOTICE by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson NOTICE OF READINESS FOR STATUS CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO STANDING ORDER (Stevenson, Theodore)
May 17, 2013 38 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE ENTRY 40 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss ONLY SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLP, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 21 by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore) Modified on 5/20/2013 (gsg).
May 17, 2013 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP (Mukerji, Indranil)
May 16, 2013 36 ANSWER to 33 Answer to Counterclaim,,, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP.(Mukerji, Indranil)
April 30, 2013 U.S. Patents Nos. 6,617,929; 6,767,813; 6,865,682; 7,782,749; 8,165,081; 8,208,438, and 8,228,827 SEVERED from this cause and assigned to Civil Action 6:13cv364. (mll, )
April 30, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER granting 32 Motion to Stay. This Motion only affects some of the patents asserted in this case. To avoid future complications arising from a partial stay, the Court SEVERS Samsung's counterclaims involving U.S. Patent Nos. 6,617,929, 6,767,813, 6,865,682, 7,782,749, 8,165,081, 8,208,438, and 8,228,827 into a separate cause of action. The Court WAIVES any required filing fee for the new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/30/13. (mll, )
April 22, 2013 34 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Stevenson, Theodore)
April 22, 2013 33 ANSWER to 31 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP by Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericsson Inc..(Stevenson, Theodore)
April 17, 2013 32 Unopposed MOTION to Stay OF PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1659 FOR CERTAIN SAMSUNG PATENTS ALSO BEING LITIGATED BEFORE THE INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
April 5, 2013 31 AMENDED ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLP. (Mukerji, Indranil)
March 19, 2013 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth Robert Adamo on behalf of All Defendants (Adamo, Kenneth)
March 19, 2013 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brian W Lee on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4052122. (Lee, Brian)
March 19, 2013 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Archit P Shah on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4051815. (Shah, Archit)
March 18, 2013 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP (Mukerji, Indranil)
March 18, 2013 26 ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP.(Mukerji, Indranil)
March 18, 2013 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gregory B Sanford on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4050289. (Sanford, Gregory)
March 18, 2013 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David W Higer on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4050255. (Higer, David)
March 18, 2013 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Edward C Donovan on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4050251. (Donovan, Edward)
March 18, 2013 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gregory S Arovas on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4050249. (Arovas, Gregory)
March 18, 2013 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sean O Christofferson on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4050242. (Christofferson, Sean)
March 18, 2013 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Indranil Mukerji on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP (Mukerji, Indranil)
March 18, 2013 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Bao Nguyen on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4048843. (Nguyen, Bao)
March 14, 2013 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Charles Earle on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP (Earle, Robert)
March 14, 2013 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Howard Reger, II on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP (Reger, Thomas)
February 7, 2013 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ramzi Ragheb Khazen on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Khazen, Ramzi)
February 1, 2013 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pierre Jean Hubert on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Hubert, Pierre)
February 1, 2013 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Trent Edward Campione on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Campione, Trent)
January 29, 2013 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT (FIRST) against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP, filed by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson.(McKool, Mike)
January 24, 2013 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph V Colaianni, Jr on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3968729. (Colaianni, Joseph)
January 11, 2013 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP (Cordell, Ruffin)
January 11, 2013 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J McKeon on behalf of All Defendants (McKeon, Michael)
January 11, 2013 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M Melsheimer on behalf of All Defendants (Melsheimer, Thomas)
December 11, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. ORDERED that Defendants Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLP have until and through March 18, 2013 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/11/2012. (gsg)
December 10, 2012 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 6, 2012 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas A Cawley on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Cawley, Douglas)
November 27, 2012 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
November 27, 2012 5 ***FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE ENTRY.*** SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es))(klb) Modified on 11/27/2012 (gsg).
November 27, 2012 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es))(klb)
November 27, 2012 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Stevenson, Theodore)
November 27, 2012 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson identifying Corporate Parent Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Corporate Parent Ericsson Holding II Inc. for Ericsson Inc.; Corporate Parent None for Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Stevenson, Theodore)
November 27, 2012 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLP ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3886875.), filed by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevenson, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ericsson Inc. et al v. Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Telecommunications America LLP
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Michael J McKeon
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Michael J McKeon
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Michael J McKeon
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericsson Inc.
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Represented By: Douglas A Cawley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson
Represented By: Douglas A Cawley
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]