Lawrence et al v. PEF Capital Properties LLC

Plaintiff: Angela Lawrence and Paul Martinez Bey
Defendant: PEF Capital Properties LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv02371
Filed: July 16, 2012
 
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
 
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: After reviewing the pleadings, file, and record in this case, the court determines that the findings and conclusions of the magistrate judge are correct, accepts them as those of the court, and dismisses without prejudice all claims asserted by Lawrence in this action for her failure to comply with a court order and failure to prosecute this action. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/18/2012) (cea)
April 23, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order: The court sua sponte moves for dismissal of this action pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) for lack of standing. Bey shall file a response to the courts sua sponte motion for dismissal by 5/13/2013. PEF shall not file a reply unless directed to do so by the court. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 4/23/2013) (jrr)
May 15, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order Denies without predjudice 16 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PEF Capital Properties LLC, Grants in Part and Denies in Part the court's 4/23/2013 sua sponte motion to dismiss 20 . ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/14/2013. ) The court directs Bey to file an amended complaint that addresses the deficiencies noted in this opinion by 6/14/2013. Any amended complaint filed by Bey must not include allegations, theories, or claims dismissed or d etermined by the court to be legally unviable. Failure to file an amended complaint by 6/14/2013, will result in dismissal of Bey's fraud claim, and this action will be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/15/2013) (tla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lawrence et al v. PEF Capital Properties LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Lawrence
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Martinez Bey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEF Capital Properties LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]