Lewis v. Texas Instruments Inc Employee Health Benefits Plan et al

Plaintiff: Iris Lewis
Defendant: Texas Instruments Inc Employee Health Benefits Plan and Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv04577
Filed: November 14, 2012
 
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: Tarrant
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1002 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2013 67 Featured Case Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, the Protective Order remains unchanged, and Plaintiff's Answer in Opposition of the Protective Order [Dkt. No. 58] is OVERRULED. (See order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 11/13/2013) (mcrd)
June 23, 2014 93 Featured Case Memorandum Opinion and Order denying without prejudice 76 MOTION for Protective Order . (See order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 6/23/2014) (mcrd) (Main Document 93 replaced on 6/23/2014) (mcrd).
July 14, 2014 95 Featured Case ORDER: Having reviewed the motions, briefs, pleadings, file, record in this case, and the 94 findings and conclusions of the magistrate judge, the court determines that the findings and conclusions of the magistrate judge are correct and accepts th em as those of the court, except that the court will deny Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Summary Judgment in light of the court's determination that Defendants' motions to dismiss should be granted rather than denied as moot. According ly, the court grants the Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas (Doc. 44 ); grants Defendant TI Employees Health Benefit Plan's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 45 ); denies as moot Plaintiff's Motio n for Summary Judgment (Doc. 78 ); denies Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 82 ); denies Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Pleading (Doc. 65 ); denies Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Motion to Leave File d on 11/13/2013 (Doc. 74 ); denies Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Pleading (Doc. 75 ); and dismisses this action with prejudice pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/14/2014) (ctf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lewis v. Texas Instruments Inc Employee Health Benefits Plan et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Lewis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Instruments Inc Employee Health Benefits Plan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]