Murchison Capital Partners, L.P. et al v. Nuance Communications, Inc

Plaintiff: John M Purtell Jr Family Irrevocable Trust, XPX MNGT LLC, Pat Sullivan, Cyndee Sullivan, Pat Foley, Paul Jenkins, Pedro Vergne, Purtell Business Ventures Ltd, Scott Roulet, Troy McCool Trust, Dr. Martin White, MD, Martin Gay White IRA Rollover, Michael Sloan, Murchison Capital Partners LP, Robert Murchison, Dr. Alan Hull, MD, Back Nine Investments Ltd, Douglas Keller, Heather Powell, Jimenez Dynasty Trust, John Purtell, Thomas White, David F McCool, Katherine McCool and Brian McCool Trust
Defendant: Nuance Communications, Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv04746
Filed: November 20, 2012
 
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order: Before the court is Defendant's 9 Amended Notice of Removal, filed 12/21/2012. The court, as required by law, has made an independent inquiry to determine whether it has subject matter jurisdiction to entertain t his action. Because the court cannot determine whether complete diversity exists between the parties, it grants Defendant's request for leave to conduct limited jurisdictional discovery to determine the citizenship of Plaintiffs. The limited dis covery shall be completed by 8/15/2013. Upon the conclusion of discovery, Defendant must file a second amended notice of removal that sets forth the citizenship of all Plaintiffs in accordance with the standards set forth by the court. Defendant shall file its second amended notice of removal by 8/19/2013. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/2/2013) (ctf)
September 30, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order Granting 5 Motion to Dismiss and Denying Motion for Sanctions filed by Nuance Communications, Inc. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 9/30/2013) (cea)
June 25, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 27 Motion for Reconsideration. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/25/2014) (twd)
November 30, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The allegations regarding the citizenships of Plaintiffs do not permit the court to determine whether complete diversity exists between the parties. Accordingly, Defendant shall file an amended notice of removal that sets forth the citizenship of all Plaintiffs in accordance with the standards set forth by the court. Defendants shall file its amended notice of removal by Friday, 12/21/2012. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/30/2012) (tln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Murchison Capital Partners, L.P. et al v. Nuance Communications, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M Purtell Jr Family Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XPX MNGT LLC
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Sullivan
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyndee Sullivan
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Foley
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Jenkins
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Vergne
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purtell Business Ventures Ltd
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Roulet
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy McCool Trust
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Martin White, MD
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Gay White IRA Rollover
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sloan
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murchison Capital Partners LP
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Murchison
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Alan Hull, MD
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Back Nine Investments Ltd
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Keller
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Powell
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimenez Dynasty Trust
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Purtell
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas White
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David F McCool
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine McCool
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian McCool Trust
Represented By: Peter D Marketos
Represented By: Leslie R Chaggaris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuance Communications, Inc
Represented By: T Ray Guy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]