Warren v. Bank of America NA

Plaintiff: Randy Warren
Defendant: Bank of America NA
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01135
Filed: March 18, 2013
 
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Dallas Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M.G. Lynn
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER ACCEPTING 24 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Brief in Support of Same, filed 3/25/2013 (doc. 6 ), is GRANTED. By separate judgment, all of Plaintiff's claims against Defendant will be DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 12/27/2013) (ctf)
March 27, 2014 37 Featured Case Order Accepting 24 Findings and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition is GRANTED. By separate judgment, all of Plaintiff's claims against Defendant will be DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/27/2014) (axm)
May 22, 2014 43 Featured Case ORDER ACCEPTING 42 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 41 Motion To Extend Time. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file an appeal based on excusable neglect or good cause. Plaintiff's notice of 4/29/2014 is timely. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/22/2014) (ykp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Warren v. Bank of America NA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Warren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Jeffrey R Seewald
Represented By: Nathan T Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]