Gogo Tribe v. Google Corp Featured Case

Plaintiff Denis Marengo is an immigration detainee at the CCA Houston Processing Center who states that he is being detained for political reasons and is barred from proceeding pro se. Nevertheless, he proceeds in a representative capacity on behalf of the Gogo and Yao tribes of Tanzania and alleges that Google and Yahoo misappropriated their names, respectively, without acknowledgment or compensation. Plaintiff asserts that he has standing to sue on the tribes\' behalf because the mother of his paternal grandfather (a/k/a great-grandmother) was Gogo and the grandmother of his maternal grandmother (a/k/a great-great-grandmother) was Yao.

Plaintiff: Gogo Tribe of Tanzania, Yao Tribe of Tanzania and Denis Maringo
Defendant: Yahoo Corporation of San Jose, California and Google Corporation of Mountain View, California
 
Case Number: 4:2007cv03087
Filed: September 18, 2007
 
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Nancy F. Atlas
 
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2007 1
Prisoner COMPLAINT against Google Corporation of Mountain View, California, Yahoo Corporation of San Jose, California (Filing fee $ 350) filed by Gogo Tribe of Tanzania, Yao Tribe of Tanzania, Denis Maringo.(kosborne, )
September 18, 2007 2
MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Denis Maringo, representative for Gogo Tribe of Tanzania filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(kosborne, )
September 24, 2007 3
NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant. Party notified, filed. (kosborne, )
September 25, 2007 4 Featured Case
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Dismissing Complaint and DENYING 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Court sanctions Denis Maringo $500.00. The Clerk's Office is instruction to accept no further complaints or petitions for filing from Denis Maringo until the sanction is paid in full and he presents advance written permission from a judicial officer in the Southern District of Texas. ( Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas ) Parties notified. (Notication of entry order sent to Warden Robert Lacy via regular mail)(kmurphy, ) Modified on 9/26/2007 (kmurphy, ).
September 25, 2007 5
FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on 09/25/07.( Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gogo Tribe v. Google Corp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gogo Tribe of Tanzania
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yao Tribe of Tanzania
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis Maringo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo Corporation of San Jose, California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Corporation of Mountain View, California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]