Jones v. The United States Postal Service

Plaintiff: Felicia N Jones
Defendant: The United States Postal Service
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv00566
Filed: February 8, 2011
 
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
 
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered GRANTING 20 MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. MOTION to Dismiss 19 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., 12 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint, 11 Amended Complaint/Coun terclaim/Crossclaim etc. and Motion to Substitute the United States of America MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint, 11 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. and Motion to Substitute the United States of America. Final Judgment to be enterd by separate order..(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
June 24, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT entered. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Case terminated on 6/24/11.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
September 6, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered DENYING 49 MOTION for Continuance of Transcript Deadlines, DENYING 52 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, DENYING 41 MOTION for Leave to Appeal.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
June 14, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered DENYING 62 MOTION to Reopen Case 4:11-cv-00566 (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
August 13, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered DENYING 84 MOTION for Judgment, DENYING 87 MOTION for Judgment, DENYING 88 MOTION for Continuance, DENYING 86 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jones v. The United States Postal Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia N Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Postal Service
Represented By: Amelia Rebecca De Los Santos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]