Reservoir, Inc. et al v. Truesdell et al

Plaintiff: Reservoir, Inc. and Mohammad Ayman Jarrah
Defendant: Justin Z. Truesdell, Rainbow Cattle Co., Inc., Rebels Honky Tonk, LLC and 26710 North I45 Limited Patnership
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv02756
Filed: September 13, 2012
 
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Nancy F. Atlas
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTED in part and DENIED in part 14 MOTION for Pleadings Judgment MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses in Amended Answer and Counterclaim (Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
October 9, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ( Status Report due by 10/25/2013)(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
February 28, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION FOLLOWING BENCH TRIAL. (Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Reservoir, Inc. et al v. Truesdell et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reservoir, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Van Richardson, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Ayman Jarrah
Represented By: Lee Van Richardson, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Z. Truesdell
Represented By: Albert Thomas Van Huff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbow Cattle Co., Inc.
Represented By: Albert Thomas Van Huff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebels Honky Tonk, LLC
Represented By: Albert Thomas Van Huff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 26710 North I45 Limited Patnership
Represented By: Albert Thomas Van Huff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]