Vackar v. Sentry Supply Inc

Plaintiff: Michael Vackar
Counter_claimant: Sentry Supply Inc
Counter_defendant: Michael Vackar
Defendant: Sentry Supply Inc
Case Number: 4:2012cv03716
Filed: December 22, 2012
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered GRANTING 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial. A Status Conference is set for 8/2/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal to address remaining issues in this case.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
January 2, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered GRANTING 37 MOTION for Sanctions, GRANTING 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counterclaims. Miscellaneous Hearing is set for 1/31/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal. This hearing will be held in place of the current docket call setting. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
November 7, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered: The court orders Vackar to pay Superior a total of $18,225.24 as damages and as a sanction. Final judgment to be entered by separate order. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
November 7, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT entered. Based on the courts Memoranda and Opinions issued on July 8, 2013, January 2, 2014, and November 7, 2014, the claims brought by Michael Vackar are dismissed with prejudice, and he takes nothing on those claims; Superior recove rs actual and exemplary damages on its counterclaims for fraud, money had and received, and defamation, in the amounts of $925.24 for actual damages on the fraud and money had and received claims, $1,500 for exemplary damages on the fraud c laim, and $10,800 on the defamation claim; and Superior recovers sanctions under Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Rule 13 of the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure, in the amount of $5,000. Case terminated on 11/7/14(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vackar v. Sentry Supply Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Vackar
Represented By: John W Ghezzi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Sentry Supply Inc
Represented By: Barry M Golden
Represented By: Barry M Golden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Michael Vackar
Represented By: John W Ghezzi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Supply Inc
Represented By: Barry M Golden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]