W & L Ventures, Inc. et al v. East West Bank

Plaintiff: Texas 1st Priorities, Inc. and W & L Ventures, Inc.
Defendant: East West Bank
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00754
Filed: March 17, 2013
 
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered DENYING 5 Opposed MOTION to Remand, DENYING 4 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint Adding New Non-Diverse Defendant.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
March 26, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 20 AMENDED MOTION. A Status Conference is set for 4/4/2014 at 05:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 1, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered GRANTING 38 MOTION to Expunge Plaintiffs' Notice of Lis Pendens. An order granting the motion to expunge is separately entered. A copy of that order is to be filed with the Official Public Records of Fort Bend County, Texas. No later than August 15, 2014, the parties are to submit a proposed form of final judgment or a statement identifying any remaining issues and what is required to resolve them.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 1, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered: For the reasons stated in this court's Memorandum and Order entered this date, the court grants the defendant's motion to expunge the lis pendens on the tracts of property identified in plaintiff's complaint. A copy of this order is to be filed with the Official Public Records of Fort Bend County, Texas.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 18, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered GRANTING 49 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment, DENYING 46 Opposed MOTION to Stay Orders on Defendant's Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. Final judgment to be entered by spearate order. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 18, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT entered. Case terminated on 8/18/14.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
March 25, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered GRANTING 8 Opposed EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION for Continuance of April 8, 2013 Submission Date on Defendant's Dispositive Motions. Responses due by 3/28/2013.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: W & L Ventures, Inc. et al v. East West Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas 1st Priorities, Inc.
Represented By: Dylan B Russell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W & L Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Dylan B Russell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East West Bank
Represented By: Gerald Scott Siegmyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]