Gate Guard Services, L.P. v. Hilda L. Solis, Secretary of Labor, United States of Department of Labor

Plaintiff: Gate Guard Services, L.P.
Defendant: The United States Department of Labor
 
Case Number: 6:2010cv00091
Filed: November 19, 2010
 
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Victoria Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: John D. Rainey
 
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER... GRANTING 106 Gate Guard's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Its Amended Motion to Seal Deposition Transcripts; and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 96 Gate Guard's Amended Motion to Seal Portions of the Deposition Transcripts of Bert Steindorf and Sidney L. Smith and Motion for Protective Order... (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey) Parties notified.(jrichards, )
February 13, 2013 135 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Gate Guard Services, L.P. and Bert Steindorf's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment 126 is Granted; The Department of Labor's Motion for Summary Judgment 123 is Denied; and The Department of Labor's counter-claims against GGS are Dismissed. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
July 24, 2013 146 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Gate Guard Services' 137 Motion to Recover Attorneys' Fees is Denied; Gate Guard Services' 144 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees is Granted. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey.) Parties notified. (yhausmann, )
April 7, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. GGS's Supplemental Motion to Recover Attorneys' Fees 147 is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey) Parties notified.(hledwig, 6)
April 9, 2014 154 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. GGS's Supplemental Motion to Recover Attorneys' Fees 147 is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge John D. Rainey) Parties notified.(hledwig, 6)
July 12, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 20 Gate Guard's Motion to Consolidate; and denying 21 DOL's Motion to Dismiss Amended Declaratory Judgment Complaint...(Signed by Judge John D. Rainey) Parties notified.(jrichards, ) Modified on 7/13/2011: To correct the date of filing. (jrichards, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gate Guard Services, L.P. v. Hilda L. Solis, Secretary of Labor, United States of Department of Labor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gate Guard Services, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Douglas Pipitone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Labor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]