Doe v. Myspace, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Jane Doe sued defendants MySpace Incorporated and News Corporation for negligence, gross negligence, fraud and negligent misrepresentation over the rape of plaintiff by a 19-year-old who had initiated contact with Jane Doe through MySpace, despite safeguards MySpace purportedly had in place.

Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Myspace, Inc. and News Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2006cv00983
Filed: December 13, 2006
 
Court: Texas Western District Court
Office: Austin Office
County: Travis
Presiding Judge: Sam Sparks
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2006 35
Case transferred in from District of SD/NY; Case Number 1:06cv7880. Original file with documents numbered 1-34, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (docs 4-34 not scanned, too voluminous), (Attachments: # 1 case opening docs# 2)(ja, )
January 5, 2007 36
MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by News Corporation, Myspace, Inc.. (Marin, Michael)
January 16, 2007 37
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kurt B. Arnold and Arnold & Itkin LLP (Arnold, Kurt)
January 16, 2007 38
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re 36 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Arnold, Kurt)
January 17, 2007 39 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Setting Hearing on 36 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2007 09:00 AM before Honorable Sam Sparks.. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mc2, )
January 19, 2007 40 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER resetting Hearing on 36 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss: Motion Hearing reset for 2/1/2007 02:00 PM before Honorable Sam Sparks.. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mc2, )
January 23, 2007 41
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice by News Corporation, Myspace, Inc.. (Marin, Michael)
January 24, 2007 42 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 41 Motion to appear pro hac vice by Clifford Thau. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mc2, )
February 8, 2007 44
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason Aron Itkin for Micajah D. Boatright by on behalf of Jane Doe. (Itkin, Jason)
February 9, 2007 45 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Micajah Boatright. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mc2, )
February 13, 2007 46 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 36 Motions to Dismiss Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mc2, )
February 13, 2007 47 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mc2, )
March 2, 2007 49
BILL OF COSTS by News Corporation, Myspace, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(dm, )
March 12, 2007 50
**DEFICIENT*** NOTICE of Filing Plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal by Jane Doe (Arnold, Kurt) Modified on 3/13/2007 (ja, ).
March 13, 2007 51
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Atty Kurt Arnold: re 50 Notice of Filing- Appeal. Document must be filed traditionally. (ja, )
March 13, 2007 52
Objections to Bill of Cost , Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Request by Jane Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Arnold, Kurt) Modified on 3/14/2007 (ja, ).
March 13, 2007 53
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jane Doe. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 405448. (mh, )
March 14, 2007 54
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 53 Notice of Appeal (mh, )
May 3, 2007 55 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 49 Bill of Costs filed by Myspace, Inc.,, News Corporation,, 52 Objections to Bill of Costs filed by Jane Doe. PARMITTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART.. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (ja, )
May 9, 2007 56
Transmitted Record on Appeal to KATHY FISCHER. re 53 Notice of Appeal (mh, )
May 11, 2007 57
Acknowledgement Receipt for Record on Appeal by Kathy Fischer. re 56 Appeal Record Transmitted (mh, )
May 18, 2007 58
Transmitted Record on Appeal forwarded to Jason A. Itkin. by Christopher Popov re 53 Notice of Appeal (mh, )
September 24, 2007 59
Letter of transmittal from USCA received for 53 Notice of Appeal filed by Jane Doe. USCA-5th Circuit Court granted appellees' motion to supplement or correct the record. (mh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Doe v. Myspace, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myspace, Inc.
Represented By: Hilary Lovett Preston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: News Corporation
Represented By: Christopher V. Popov
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]