Lamebook, LLC v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case

Lamebook is suing Facebook for declaratory judgement that its use of the Lamebook mark (name) and the look of its website are a parody of the Facebook Website and are thus protected forms of expression under the First Amendment of the United States Constitution.

Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lamebook, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00833
Filed: November 4, 2010
 
Court: Texas Western District Court
Office: Austin Office
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER Granting 40 Stipulated Dimissal and DISMISSING CASE in all respect and without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, )
August 25, 2011 40 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Facebook, Inc., Lamebook, LLC. (Civins, Conor)
August 16, 2011 39 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint ; Facebook, Inc. answer due 8/24/2011. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, )
August 15, 2011 38 ADR Report Filed - Joint Report on ADR by Facebook, Inc., Lamebook, LLC(Civins, Conor)
August 10, 2011 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Norberg, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2011 36 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint ; Facebook, Inc. answer due 8/10/2011. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, )
July 18, 2011 35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time)(Norberg, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2011 Notice of Correction: re Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, 32 Scheduling Order. The document has been modified to add the appropriate scheduling order deadline information. (mc2, )
June 30, 2011 34 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint ; Facebook, Inc. answer due 7/20/2011. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, )
June 29, 2011 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Norberg, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2011 Set Scheduling Order Deadlines (set by Scheduling Order, Dkt. 32 ): ADR Report Deadline due by 8/15/2011. Docket Call set for 7/27/2012 11:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks. Amended Pleadings due by 10/17/2011. Discovery due by 5/1/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 10/17/2011. Motions due by 5/29/2012. (mc2, )
June 15, 2011 32 Scheduling Order. ADR due by 8/15/2011. Supplemental pleadings and joinder of parties by 10/17/11. Discovery due by 5/1/11. All disposotive motions due by 5/29/11. Docket call to be held 7/27/12, 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mc2, ) Modified on 7/11/2011 to add deadline text (mc2, ).
June 15, 2011 31 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mc2, )
April 19, 2011 30 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on March 25, 2011, Proceedings Transcribed: All Pending Matters. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-916-5564. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 5/10/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2011. (Reznik, Lily)
April 4, 2011 29 NOTICE of Vacation by atty Peter D. Kennedy. (klw, )
March 29, 2011 28 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Facebook, Inc. for proceedings held on 03/25/11. Proceedings Transcribed: Pending Matters Hearing. Court Reporter: Lily Reznik. (klw, )
March 25, 2011 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 3/25/2011. Motion to Dismiss 19 taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(klw, )
March 24, 2011 26 Proposed Scheduling Order Joint by Facebook, Inc., Lamebook, LLC. (Civins, Conor)
March 1, 2011 25 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 24 Motion to Continue. Hearing reset for 3/25/2011 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, )
March 1, 2011 24 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing on All Pending Matters by Facebook, Inc.. (Kennedy, Peter)
February 28, 2011 23 Featured Case ORDER setting Pending Matters Hearing for 3/14/2011 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, )
February 16, 2011 22 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Facebook, Inc., re 19 MOTION to Dismiss with proposed Order filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc. (Kennedy, Peter) Modified on 2/16/2011 delete duplicate text (klw, ).
February 7, 2011 21 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Lamebook, LLC, re 19 MOTION to Dismiss with proposed Order filed by Defendant Facebook, Inc. and Declaration of Conor M. Civins (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Civins, Conor)
February 2, 2011 20 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/24/2011. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, )
January 24, 2011 19 MOTION to Dismiss with proposed Order by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Charlston Declaration, # 2 Exhibit DuBois Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Johnston Delcaration)(Kennedy, Peter)
December 22, 2010 18 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint ; Facebook, Inc. answer due 1/24/2011. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mc2, )
December 14, 2010 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Peter)
December 14, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 9 Motion for Jeffrey Thomas Norberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Facebook, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, )
December 14, 2010 15 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion for Anne Peck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Facebook, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, )
December 14, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion for Michael G. Rhodes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Facebook, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, )
December 14, 2010 13 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion for Gavin L. Charlston to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Facebook, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw, )
December 10, 2010 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter D. Kennedy for G. Charlston w/ proposed order ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-3265662) by on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. (Kennedy, Peter)
December 10, 2010 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter D. Kennedy for M. Rhodes w/ proposed order ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-3265661) by on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. (Kennedy, Peter)
December 10, 2010 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter D. Kennedy for A. Peck with proposed order ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-3265660) by on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. (Kennedy, Peter)
December 10, 2010 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter D. Kennedy for J. Norberg w/ proposed order ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-3265657) by on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. (Kennedy, Peter)
December 10, 2010 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter D. Kennedy on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Kennedy, Peter)
November 30, 2010 7 Letters to Anne Peck, Gavin Charlston, Jeffrey Norberg and Michael Rhodes re: non-admitted status. (klw, )
November 29, 2010 6 NOTICE of Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer by Lamebook, LLC (Civins, Conor)
November 5, 2010 5 Report on Trademark and copy of complaint sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tdk, )
November 5, 2010 4 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc.. (tdk, )
November 5, 2010 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lamebook, LLC. Corrected (Civins, Conor)
November 4, 2010 Case Assigned to Judge Sam Sparks. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (tdk, )
November 4, 2010 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lamebook, LLC. (Civins, Conor)
November 4, 2010 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0542-3187412), filed by Lamebook, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet JS44, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Civins, Conor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lamebook, LLC v. Facebook, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamebook, LLC
Represented By: Conor M. Civins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]