ExxonMobil Global Services Company et al v. Gensym Corporation et al

Defendant: Versata Enterprises, Inc., Gensym Corporation and ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
Third Party Defendant: Intelligent Laboratory Solutions, Inc.
Counter Plaintiff: Gensym Corporation
Plaintiff: ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company, ExxonMobil Global Services Company and ExxonMobil Corporation
Counter Defendant: ExxonMobil Global Services Company and Exxon Mobil Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012cv00442
Filed: May 17, 2012
Court: Texas Western District Court
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: John D. Rainey
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 85 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John D. Rainey. (kkc)
March 26, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 11 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John D. Rainey. (kkc)
March 27, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, DENYING 36 MOTION to Dismiss Gensym's Second Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Judge John D. Rainey. (kkc)
March 28, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, GRANTING 61 Motion to Dismiss ExxonMobil's Alter Ego Theory. ExxonMobil is granted leave to amend its complaint no later than 14 days after entry of this Order, or this claim will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge John D. Rainey. (kkc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ExxonMobil Global Services Company et al v. Gensym Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Versata Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Amir H. Alavi
Represented By: Thomas H. Watkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gensym Corporation
Represented By: Amir H. Alavi
Represented By: Thomas H. Watkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
Represented By: Andrew A. Kassof
Represented By: Michael L. Navarre
Represented By: Shannon H. Ratliff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: Intelligent Laboratory Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Amir H. Alavi
Represented By: Thomas H. Watkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Gensym Corporation
Represented By: Amir H. Alavi
Represented By: Thomas H. Watkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
Represented By: Seth A. Gastwirth
Represented By: Andrew A. Kassof
Represented By: Michael L. Navarre
Represented By: Shannon H. Ratliff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ExxonMobil Global Services Company
Represented By: Seth A. Gastwirth
Represented By: Andrew A. Kassof
Represented By: Michael L. Navarre
Represented By: Shannon H. Ratliff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ExxonMobil Corporation
Represented By: Andrew A. Kassof
Represented By: Seth A. Gastwirth
Represented By: Michael L. Navarre
Represented By: Shannon H. Ratliff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: ExxonMobil Global Services Company
Represented By: Andrew A. Kassof
Represented By: Michael L. Navarre
Represented By: Shannon H. Ratliff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Shannon H. Ratliff
Represented By: Michael L. Navarre
Represented By: Andrew A. Kassof
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]