Northern Natural Gas Company v. Sheerin et al

Plaintiff: Northern Natural Gas Company
Defendant: Betty Lou Sheerin and James L. Sheerin
 
Case Number: 5:2009cv00709
Filed: August 28, 2009
 
Court: Texas Western District Court
Office: San Antonio Office
County: Bexar
Presiding Judge: Xavier Rodriguez
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2010 20 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. The response is due by 4/2/10. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)
June 21, 2010 31 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)
July 19, 2010 38 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 34 Motion to supplement First Amended Complaint and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)
December 14, 2009 9 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 6 Motion to Dismiss ; DENYING 6 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Northern Natural Gas Company v. Sheerin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Natural Gas Company
Represented By: Marc F. Wiegand
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Lou Sheerin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Sheerin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]