K. v. Visa Cigna Network Pos Plan

Defendant: Visa Cigna Network Pos Plan
Plaintiff: M. K.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00073
Filed: May 16, 2013
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Northern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 20 *** Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 12 Motion to Transfer Case.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013) Modified on 5/15/2013 (lhklc3, COURT STAFF).[Transferred from California Northern on 5/16/2013.]
May 15, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Correction of Docket # 19 ORDER Granting Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/15/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 5/16/2013.]
October 14, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Based on the above reasoning, the court concludes that Cignas decision to deny benefits under the Plan was reasonable and supported by substantial evidence in the record. Accordingly,M.K.s appeal of the determination is DISMISSED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Each party shall bear its and her own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 10/14/2014. (jds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: K. v. Visa Cigna Network Pos Plan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa Cigna Network Pos Plan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. K.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]