Busby v. Sanders et al

Defendant: Michael D. Lyon, Dean Sanders and Weber County
Plaintiff: Joshua Busby
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00085
Filed: June 13, 2013
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Northern Office
County: Weber
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REISSUED MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER TO CURE THE DEFICIENT COMPLAINT.Plaintiff must within thirty days cure the deficiencies. The Clerk's Office shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the Pro Se Litigant Guide. Plaintiff fails to time cure the above deficiencies according to this Order's instructions, this action will be dismissed without further notice. Denying 6 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/23/2014. (kpf)
June 19, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and DISMISSAL ORDER: It is therefore ordered that Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim under 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), failure to follow Court orders, and failure to prosecute. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 6/18/2014. (kpf)
November 22, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENT COMPLAINT. Plaintiff must within thirty days cure the deficiencies noted above. The Clerk's Office shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the Pro Se Litigant Guide. If Plaintiff fails to timely cure the above deficiencies according to this Order's instructions, this action will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/21/2013. (kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Busby v. Sanders et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Lyon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Sanders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Busby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]