Flitton v. Primary Residential

Case Number: 2:2003cv00481
Filed: May 23, 2003
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Referring Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2008 390 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 378 Motion to Compel. For particulars of this order re: Motion to Compel, please see image. In order to obtain its award, defendant shall submit to the court within 10 days of the date of this order an affidavit and cost memorandum detailing the reasonable expenses, including attorney fees incurred in connection with the subpoena served on Mr. Strosser. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/17/08. (ce)
January 13, 2009 426 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/13/09. (jwt)
May 7, 2009 464 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES granting 430 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 5/7/09. (jwt)
June 16, 2009 484 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 460 Motion Review of Clerk's Denial of Costs to Defendant; PRMI is awarded $820.00 in relation to costs associated with the prosecution of its successful counterclaim. Granting in p art and denying in part 462 Motion Review of Clerk's April 16, 2009 Taxation of Costs to Plaintiff; award is reduced by $372.07 for appeal-related copy costs. Granting in part and denying in part 471 Motion to Strike 467 Affidavit of Attorneys Fees of John V. Mayer; Plaintiff is awarded an additional $6000.00 in attorney fees and costs related to post judgment motions. (See order for details). Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 6/16/09. (las)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flitton v. Primary Residential
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]