Miranda v. St Ut, et al

 
Case Number: 2:2003cv01097
Filed: December 15, 2003
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
Referring Judge: David Nuffer
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2009 153 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 130 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 02/13/2009. (asp)
February 24, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 158 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 02/24/2009. (asp)
February 26, 2009 197 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 165 Motion in Limine to Exclude all Video Recordings of Troy Kell/Lonnie Blackmon Incident (docket no. 165 . Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/26/09. (ce)
February 26, 2009 199 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 192 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/26/2009. (rlr)
February 27, 2009 201 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION Granting in Part and Taking Under Advisement 160 Motion in Limine Re: Criminal History. It is further Ordered that Defendant is precluded from any mention, admission, or description of any prior criminal history, juvenile convic tions, alleged acts of criminal activity of the Plaintiff, Jacques Dupree Miranda, other than admission that Plaintiff has been convicted of a crime punishable by imprisonment for more than one year, pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 609(a)(1). The specifics of said convictions are irrelevant, immaterial and prejudicial. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/27/2009. (rlr)
May 11, 2009 231 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 223 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 05/11/2009. (asp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Miranda v. St Ut, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]