Landress et al v. Hiko Bell Mining and Oil et al

 
Case Number: 2:2006cv00734
Filed: August 31, 2006
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
Presiding Judge: David Sam
 
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:0078m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order on Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 08/19/2009. See image for details.(asp)
September 11, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION: the 5/27/2009 90 Summary Judgment is amended to delete the following provision: Plaintiffs are further directed to submit to the Court, prior to distribution, the proposed proxy solicitation statements and notice for the proposed shareholder meeting and the Court retains continuing jurisdiction to approve, amend and otherwise allow such proxy statement as it may deem appropriate. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/10/09. (ce)
February 8, 2010 116 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 110 Motion for Writ ; denying 111 Motion for Writ. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 02/08/2010. (asp)
March 4, 2010 122 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 118 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 03/04/2010. (asp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Landress et al v. Hiko Bell Mining and Oil et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]