C&A Construction Company v. DHC Development et al

Plaintiff: C&A Construction Company
Defendant: DHC Development and Steven P. Danko
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv00258
Filed: April 2, 2008
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Bruce S. Jenkins
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2011 234 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 229 Motion for Entry of Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that Lynn A. Gilbert, as Trustee of the Black Diamond ConstructionTrust, and the Black Diamond Construction 1 Business Trust are hereby joined as partiesPlaintiff in the above-captioned matter, and shall be bound by the Judgment of this court to be entered herein;IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant DHC Development, LLC is awarded judgment against Plaintiff C&A Construction Company, Inc. in the amount of $385,290.00, together with its costs of action; and that the claims of Plaintiffs C&A Construction Company,Inc. And its successors in interest shall be dismissed upon the merits, with prejudice; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the remaining funds on deposit with Zions First National Bank as alternate security for Plaintiffs' mechanic's lien claim shall be released to DHC forthwith. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 6/7/2011. (ce)
April 26, 2013 352 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 343 Motion to Reassign Case. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 04/26/2013. (asp)
September 12, 2013 372 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION that for the reasons explained in this courts Memorandum Opinion & Order, filed June 7, 2011 CM/ECF No. 234 , and for clarity of the record, the Black Diamond Construction 1 Business Trust, and Lynn A. Gilbert, in his capacity as its Trustee, are hereby joined as parties Plaintiff in the above-captioned matter nunc pro tunc to June 7, 2011 ; denying 325 Motion for Restoration of Alternate Security ; denying 327 Motion to Strike ; denying 329 Motion to Stay ; denying 331 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; granting in part and denying in part 328 Motion to Dismiss Party ; denying without prejudice 362 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; denying 341 Motion for Trial Date ; that t he above-captioned action is hereby calendared for a Final Pretrial Conference on October 9, 2013, beginning at 1:30 p.m. ; counsel must prepare and submit an agreed form of proposed Pretrial Order, signed by all counsel and pro se parties, to the court not later than October 4, 2013. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 09/12/2013. (asp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: C&A Construction Company v. DHC Development et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C&A Construction Company
Represented By: R. Willis Orton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHC Development
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven P. Danko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]