Arlin Geophysical et al v. USA

Plaintiff: Arlin Geophysical and Laura Olson
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv00414
Filed: May 23, 2008
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2410 Actions Affecting Property on which United States had Lien

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2011 290 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION and Orderfinding as moot 276 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 09/29/2011. (tls)
October 20, 2011 300 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDERgranting 265 Defendant's Motions to Compel; granting 283 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 10/20/2011. (tls)
October 31, 2012 356 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 316 Motion for Sanctions Against Counterclaim Defendant Stephen G. Homer for Failure to Comply with a Court Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/31/12 (alt)
October 31, 2012 357 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 317 Motion for Sanctions Against Counterclaim Defendant Stephen G. Homer for Failure to Appear for Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/31/12 (alt)
May 2, 2014 403 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER overruling objection to magistrate judge decision. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/2/14 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Arlin Geophysical et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlin Geophysical
Represented By: David E Ross, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Olson
Represented By: Perry A. Bsharah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]