Questar Exploration and Production v. Lambeth et al

Plaintiff: Questar Exploration and Production
Defendant: Cecelia P. Lambeth, Alpine Springs, John D. Chasel and Evan Gentile
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv00455
Filed: June 11, 2008
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Uintah
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: denying 98 Motion to Stay; denying 98 Motion for Relief from Judgment; granting 102 Motion for Disbursement of Funds; denying 104 Motion to Stay. The Court will enter an Order directing the disbursement of funds separately. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/28/2011. (las)
December 17, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 41 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting 48 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/17/2009. (asp)
November 16, 2010 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 74 Cross-Claimant John Chasel and Evan Gentile's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 95 Motion for Extension of Time. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of John Chasel and Evan Gentile, quieting title in the subject property. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/16/2010. (las)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Questar Exploration and Production v. Lambeth et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Questar Exploration and Production
Represented By: William E. Ward
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecelia P. Lambeth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpine Springs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Chasel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Gentile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]