Mountain Dudes v. Split Rock et al

Plaintiff: Mountain Dudes
Defendant: Split Rock, Split Rock Fine Homes Real Estate, Split Rock Realty, Split Rock Fine Homes, Entrada at Snow Canyon Property Owner's Association, Joseph L. Platt, Bartley Smith, Weldon Larsen, Kent L. Bylund, Mary Musgrave and Brady Platt
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv00940
Filed: December 5, 2008
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2011 125 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Mountain Dudes is directed to respond in writing within 20 days from the date of this order to show why this case and the consolidated case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Moreover, Mountain Dudes has 20 days from the dates of this order to show good cause for failing to serve the Doe defendants. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/12/2011. (jtj)
February 28, 2011 133 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 127 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; finding as moot 132 Motion for Joinder in Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 2/28/2011. (rlr)
April 20, 2011 136 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 62 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 72 Motion to Bifurcate; granting 88 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying as moot 115 Motion to Continue. As a result of this order, the only issue left for trial is damages related to Split Rocks breach of contract. The parties are instructed to meet and confer to attempt to stipulate to a scheduling order setting dates for all event s remaining in this action, up to and including trial. The parties shall submit a joint order within 30 days of this Order, and if they cannot agree to such an order, they shall submit their proposed orders within that time. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 4/21/2011. (jtj)
November 9, 2012 164 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order of Default as to Defendant Split Rock, Inc-granting 152 Motion for Default Judgment. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, RULED, AND DECREED that judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff, Mountain Dudes, LLC, against Defendant and Consolidated-Plaintiff Split Rock, Inc. in the amount of $1,175,507.98. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/9/12. (jmr)
November 9, 2012 165 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT-vAccordingly, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, RULED, AND DECREED that judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff, Mountain Dudes, LLC, against Defendant and Consolidated-Plaintiff Split Rock, Inc. in the amount of $1,175,507.98. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/9/12. (jmr)
September 29, 2013 209 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting 178 Motion for Supplemental Proceedings ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 189 Report and Recommendations ; denying 202 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 09/27/2013. (asp)
January 7, 2014 227 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 01/07/2014. (tls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mountain Dudes v. Split Rock et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Dudes
Represented By: Clay W. Stucki
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Split Rock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Split Rock Fine Homes Real Estate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Split Rock Realty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Split Rock Fine Homes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entrada at Snow Canyon Property Owner's Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph L. Platt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bartley Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weldon Larsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent L. Bylund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Musgrave
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady Platt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]