Wilcox v. Career Step et al

Plaintiff: Aimee L. Wilcox
Defendant: Career Step, Andrea L. Anaya, Eugene Anaya, Christopher L. Dunn, Celeste Harjehausen, Marvin D. Lofin, West Virginia State Community and Technical College, Arapahoe Community College, Central Carolina Technical College, Emily Griffith Opportunity School, Austin Community College, Laramie County Community College and Everett Community College
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv00998
Filed: December 30, 2008
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:0101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2010 104 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 33 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; granting 39 Motion to Dismiss on sovereign immunity grounds ; denying 42 Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction/Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 12/1/2010. (jtj)
September 29, 2011 139 Featured Case ORDER and MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 109 Motion for Discovery; Motions terminated: 109 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery Expedited filed by Aimee L. Wilcox. See order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 9/29/11. (jmr)
November 30, 2012 217 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-granting 166 Motion to Amend/Correct Expert Report and Plaintiff must produce her expert report no later than ten days from the date of this order; denying 188 Motion for Protective Order; granting 190 Motion for Scheduling Order /Fact Discovery deadline. No later than six weeks from the date of this order, Plaintiff may depose the parties listed in the order. The depositions must be limited to the discovery the Career Step Defendants prov ided Plaintiff on and after August 17, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties counter reports are due three weeks after Plaintiffs expert report deadline. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 26(c)(3) and 37(a)(5)(B), the Court DENIES Plaintiff reasonable expenses incurred in defending against the motion for a protective order. Other circumstances make an award of expenses unjust where the original fact discovery deadline passed over three months ago, and the Career Step Defendants have already filed dispositive motions. (Docket No. 191.) See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/30/12. (jmr)
November 30, 2012 220 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance to Conduct Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(d)-denying 204 Motion to Continue; terminating as moot 216 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 176 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 183 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; re 176 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 183 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Set Deadlines as to 176 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 183 MOTION for Summary Judgment .( Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2013 03:00 PM in Room 102 before Judge Clark Waddoups.); See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/30/12. (jmr)
March 6, 2013 245 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 174 Motion for Summary Judgment. The court GRANTS Defendants motion as to Plaintiffs claims for copyright infringement, accounting, fraudulent inducement, and intentional interference with prospective economic relations. The court DENIES the motion as to Plaintiffs claim for abuse of personal identity. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/6/13. (jmr)
March 6, 2013 246 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order- granting 176 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/6/13. (jmr)
February 19, 2010 97 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 33 Motion for Joinder; granting 54 Motion for Joinder; granting 11 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Claims for Relief ; granting 21 Motion for Joinder. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 2/19/2010. (las)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wilcox v. Career Step et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee L. Wilcox
Represented By: Gary D. E. Pierce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Career Step
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea L. Anaya
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Anaya
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher L. Dunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celeste Harjehausen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin D. Lofin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia State Community and Technical College
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arapahoe Community College
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Carolina Technical College
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Griffith Opportunity School
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Community College
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laramie County Community College
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everett Community College
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]