Homeworx Franchising v. Meadows et al

 
Case Number: 2:2009cv00011
Filed: January 7, 2009
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Assault Libel & Slander Office
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/26/09. (jwt)
February 4, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER: granting 33 Amended Motion to join third parties as counter defendants; An amended answer and counterclaim that names the Proposed Counterclaim Defendants and serve said counterclaim in accordance with rule 4 of the F ederal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than February 24, 2010; finding as moot 22 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 29 Motion to Join Third Parties as Counterdefendants; finding as moot 30 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 02/03/2010. (kpf)
October 14, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 62 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant(s) Counterdefendants Axis Pointe Inc and Blum Capital Partners, 58 MOTION for More Definite Statement, 57 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaim: magistrate judge recommends granting 58 Motion and denying 57 and 62 Motions. Objections to R&R due by 10/28/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/13/10 (alt)
November 17, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 66 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: accordingly, 57 Motion to Dismiss is denied, 58 Motion for More Definite Statement is granted, and 62 Motion for Default Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/17/10 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Homeworx Franchising v. Meadows et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]