Lee et al v. State of Utah et al

Plaintiff: Raymond Lee and Sherril Lee
Defendant: State of Utah, University of Utah Health Sciences Center and United States Veterans Administration
Case Number: 2:2009cv00544
Filed: June 15, 2009
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 07/22/2010. (kpf)
September 1, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS-denying 39 Motion for Sanctions; denying 30 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 9/1/10. (jmr)
June 26, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 74 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 6/26/12 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. State of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Lee
Represented By: S. Clark Newhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherril Lee
Represented By: S. Clark Newhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Utah Health Sciences Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Veterans Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.